U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Vermont

vermont Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Vermont
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:19-cr-00026-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Read
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2020
  • April 24, 2020: [Notice of Appearance - Defendant]
October, 2019
  • October 11, 2019: [Plea Agreement Hearing]
  • October 07, 2019: [Notice of Hearing]
  • October 01, 2019: [Notice of Hearing]
September, 2019
  • September 30, 2019: [Plea Agreement]
  • September 03, 2019: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
August, 2019
  • August 28, 2019: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • August 28, 2019: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
July, 2019
  • July 24, 2019: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • July 22, 2019: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • July 22, 2019: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • July 02, 2019: [~Util - Ruling on Motions]
  • July 02, 2019: [Order]
  • July 02, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • July 02, 2019: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
June, 2019
  • June 21, 2019: [Suppress]
May, 2019
  • May 23, 2019: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Pretrial Motions]
  • May 20, 2019: [Extension of Time to File Pretrial Motions]
April, 2019
  • April 03, 2019: [Notice of Appearance - Defendant]
February, 2019
  • February 22, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • February 22, 2019: [Exhibit List]
  • February 22, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • February 22, 2019: [~Util - Ruling on Motions]
  • February 20, 2019: [Order Scheduling a Detention Hearing]
  • February 20, 2019: [Pretrial Scheduling Order]
  • February 20, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 (NEF is sent - PDF is sealed)]
  • February 20, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • February 20, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • February 20, 2019: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • February 20, 2019: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • February 19, 2019: [Detention]
  • February 19, 2019: [Indictment Unsealed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.