U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Vermont

vermont Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Vermont
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:19-cr-00021-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Whitman
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
February, 2021
  • February 22, 2021: [Attorney Substitution]
  • February 22, 2021: [Transfer Out/Probationer]
December, 2019
  • December 06, 2019: [Judgment]
  • December 06, 2019: [Sentencing]
  • December 02, 2019: [Sentencing Memorandum and Motion for Downward Departure]
  • December 02, 2019: [Sentencing Memorandum]
October, 2019
  • October 02, 2019: [Receipt for Payment (criminal debt)]
  • October 01, 2019: [Procedural / Scheduling Order]
  • October 01, 2019: [Notice of Hearing]
August, 2019
  • August 21, 2019: [Procedural / Scheduling Order]
  • August 21, 2019: [Notice of Hearing]
  • August 08, 2019: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • August 08, 2019: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • August 08, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 08, 2019: [~Util - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • August 08, 2019: [Plea Agreement]
July, 2019
  • July 09, 2019: [Notice of Hearing]
  • July 01, 2019: [Notice of Docket Entry Correction (PDF) - (ECF Admin Only)]
June, 2019
  • June 27, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • June 27, 2019: [Motion Hearing]
  • June 27, 2019: [~Util - Ruling on Motions]
  • June 24, 2019: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
  • June 24, 2019: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • June 21, 2019: [Revocation of Release]
May, 2019
  • May 23, 2019: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Pretrial Motions]
  • May 22, 2019: [Extension of Time to File Pretrial Motions]
March, 2019
  • March 13, 2019: [Notice of Appearance - Defendant]
February, 2019
  • February 22, 2019: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • February 22, 2019: [Bond Hearing]
  • February 21, 2019: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • February 20, 2019: [Notice of Hearing]
  • February 20, 2019: [Pretrial Scheduling Order]
  • February 20, 2019: [Initial Appearance]
  • February 20, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • February 20, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • February 20, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 (NEF is sent - PDF is sealed)]
  • February 20, 2019: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • February 20, 2019: [Indictment Unsealed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.