U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Vermont

vermont Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Vermont
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:19-cr-00035-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Bratan
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2019
  • April 05, 2019: [Judgment]
  • April 05, 2019: [Sentencing]
  • April 05, 2019: [~Util - Ruling on Motions]
March, 2019
  • March 26, 2019: [Sentencing Memorandum]
  • March 14, 2019: [Procedural / Scheduling Order]
  • March 14, 2019: [Notice of Hearing]
  • March 08, 2019: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • March 08, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • March 08, 2019: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • March 04, 2019: [Notice of Hearing]
  • March 01, 2019: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
February, 2019
  • February 28, 2019: [Plea Agreement]
  • February 28, 2019: [Information - Felony]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.