U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Vermont

vermont Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Vermont
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:19-cr-00032-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Gonzalez-Feliciano
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
August, 2021
  • August 02, 2021: [Transfer Out/Probationer]
September, 2019
  • September 18, 2019: [Judgment]
  • September 18, 2019: [~Util - Terminate Parties]
  • September 17, 2019: [Sentencing]
  • September 16, 2019: [Sentencing Memorandum]
  • September 11, 2019: [Sentencing Memorandum]
July, 2019
  • July 02, 2019: [Procedural / Scheduling Order]
  • July 02, 2019: [Notice of Hearing]
June, 2019
  • June 25, 2019: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • June 25, 2019: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • June 25, 2019: [~Util - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • June 25, 2019: [Plea Agreement]
  • June 11, 2019: [Notice of Hearing]
May, 2019
  • May 07, 2019: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Pretrial Motions]
  • May 06, 2019: [Extension of Time to File Pretrial Motions]
March, 2019
  • March 07, 2019: [Pretrial Scheduling Order]
  • March 07, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • March 07, 2019: [~Util - Terminate Deadlines]
  • March 04, 2019: [Notice of Hearing]
  • March 01, 2019: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • March 01, 2019: [Notice of Appearance - Defendant]
February, 2019
  • February 28, 2019: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.