U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Vermont

vermont Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Vermont
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:19-cr-00036-1
  • Case Name: USA v. St. Onge
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2022
  • October 25, 2022: [Receipt for Payment (criminal debt)]
May, 2021
  • May 18, 2021: [Amended Judgment]
  • May 18, 2021: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
April, 2021
  • April 30, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 28, 2021: [Judgment]
  • April 28, 2021: [Sentencing]
  • April 27, 2021: [Video Conference Waiver]
  • April 26, 2021: [Notice of Docket Entry Correction (ECF Admin Only)]
  • April 26, 2021: [Supplemental Document(s)]
  • April 26, 2021: [Order on Motion to Seal (NEF is sent - Order is not sealed)]
  • April 26, 2021: [Sentencing Memorandum and Motion for Downward Departure]
  • April 23, 2021: [Sentencing Memorandum]
  • April 23, 2021: [File Under Seal (NEF is sent - Entry and PDF visible)]
March, 2021
  • March 24, 2021: [Video Conference Waiver]
  • March 18, 2021: [Procedural / Scheduling Order]
  • March 18, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
February, 2021
  • February 19, 2021: [Order on Motion to Seal (NEF is sent - Order is not sealed)]
  • February 17, 2021: [File Under Seal (NEF is sent - Entry and PDF visible)]
  • February 17, 2021: [Continue]
  • February 17, 2021: [File Under Seal (NEF is sent - PDF is Sealed)(COURT USE ONLY)]
  • February 12, 2021: [Order on Motion to Seal (NEF is sent - Order is not sealed)]
  • February 12, 2021: [Order on Motion to Extend Time]
  • February 12, 2021: [Order on Sealed Motion (Sealed - No NEF)]
  • February 12, 2021: [File Under Seal (NEF is sent - Entry and PDF visible)]
  • February 12, 2021: [Sealed Motion (Sealed - No NEF)(COURT USE ONLY)]
  • February 12, 2021: [Extension of Time]
  • February 02, 2021: [Procedural / Scheduling Order]
  • February 01, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
January, 2021
  • January 26, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • January 26, 2021: [Continue]
October, 2020
  • October 23, 2020: [Transcript]
  • October 19, 2020: [Procedural / Scheduling Order]
  • October 19, 2020: [Notice of Hearing]
  • October 19, 2020: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • October 19, 2020: [Plea Agreement]
  • October 01, 2020: [Notice of Hearing]
February, 2020
  • February 20, 2020: [Procedural / Scheduling Order]
  • February 20, 2020: [Notice of Hearing]
  • February 20, 2020: [Transcript]
  • February 11, 2020: [Notice of Docket Entry Removal - (ECF Admin Only)]
  • February 11, 2020: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • February 11, 2020: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • February 11, 2020: [~Util - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • February 11, 2020: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • February 10, 2020: [Plea Agreement]
  • February 10, 2020: [Information - Felony]
January, 2020
  • January 23, 2020: [Plea Agreement]
  • January 06, 2020: [Notice of Hearing]
December, 2019
  • December 20, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • December 19, 2019: [Continue]
  • December 12, 2019: [Notice of Hearing]
  • December 09, 2019: [Notice of Hearing]
  • December 06, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • December 05, 2019: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
  • December 05, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • December 04, 2019: [Continue]
  • December 04, 2019: [Notice (Other)]
  • December 04, 2019: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
  • December 04, 2019: [Motions No Longer Referred]
  • December 03, 2019: [Order]
  • December 03, 2019: [Motions Referred]
  • December 02, 2019: [Release from Custody]
  • December 02, 2019: [Reconsideration, Review, or to Vacate Order of Detention]
November, 2019
  • November 12, 2019: [Order]
  • November 04, 2019: [Notice of Hearing]
October, 2019
  • October 31, 2019: [Motion Hearing]
  • October 31, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • October 11, 2019: [Reply to Response to Motion]
September, 2019
  • September 30, 2019: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
  • September 27, 2019: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • September 13, 2019: [Compel]
July, 2019
  • July 30, 2019: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Pretrial Motions]
  • July 29, 2019: [Extension of Time to File Pretrial Motions]
  • July 08, 2019: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Pretrial Motions]
  • July 03, 2019: [Extension of Time to File Pretrial Motions]
June, 2019
  • June 19, 2019: [Extension of Time to File Pretrial Motions]
May, 2019
  • May 21, 2019: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration ]
  • May 21, 2019: [Order on Sealed Motion (Sealed - No NEF)]
April, 2019
  • April 24, 2019: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • April 03, 2019: [Order on Motion to File Under Seal (NEF is sent - Order is not sealed)]
  • April 03, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • April 03, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • April 03, 2019: [~Util - Ruling on Motions]
March, 2019
  • March 29, 2019: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • March 29, 2019: [Order Scheduling a Detention Hearing]
  • March 29, 2019: [Pretrial Scheduling Order]
  • March 29, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 (NEF is sent - PDF is sealed)]
  • March 29, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • March 29, 2019: [Initial Appearance]
  • March 29, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • March 29, 2019: [File Under Seal (NEF is sent - PDF is Sealed)(COURT USE ONLY)]
  • March 29, 2019: [Supplemental Document(s)]
  • March 28, 2019: [Detention]
  • March 28, 2019: [Indictment]
  • March 11, 2019: [Notice of Hearing]
  • March 11, 2019: [CJA 20 - Appointment]
  • March 07, 2019: [Request for Writ]
  • March 07, 2019: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.