U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Vermont

vermont Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Vermont
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:11-cr-00046-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Savo
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2020
  • April 28, 2020: [Notice of Appearance - Defendant]
February, 2020
  • February 18, 2020: [Judgment on Revocation]
December, 2019
  • December 12, 2019: [Notice of Hearing]
  • December 04, 2019: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • December 04, 2019: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
June, 2019
  • June 04, 2019: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • June 04, 2019: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
May, 2019
  • May 10, 2019: [Notice of Hearing]
March, 2019
  • March 11, 2019: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • March 08, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 (NEF is sent - PDF is sealed)]
  • March 08, 2019: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • March 08, 2019: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • March 08, 2019: [Document Unsealed]
  • March 07, 2019: [Probation Form 12 (Sealed - No NEF)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.