U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Vermont

vermont Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Vermont
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:19-cr-00031-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Flowers
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 16, 2022: [Order of Prosecutorial Obligation Under Fed. R. Crim. P. 5(f)]
  • December 16, 2022: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • December 16, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • December 16, 2022: [Probation Form 12]
  • December 16, 2022: [CJA 20 - Appointment]
March, 2021
  • March 01, 2021: [Transcript]
July, 2020
  • July 21, 2020: [Judgment]
  • July 21, 2020: [~Util - Terminate Parties]
  • July 21, 2020: [Exhibit List]
  • July 21, 2020: [Sentencing]
  • July 21, 2020: [~Util - Ruling on Motions]
  • July 21, 2020: [Statement by Defendant re: Presentence Report]
  • July 20, 2020: [Supplemental Sentencing Memorandum]
  • July 13, 2020: [Sentencing Memorandum and Motion for Downward Departure]
  • July 10, 2020: [Sentencing Memorandum]
June, 2020
  • June 18, 2020: [Procedural / Scheduling Order]
  • June 18, 2020: [Notice of Hearing]
April, 2020
  • April 17, 2020: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • April 17, 2020: [Continue]
January, 2020
  • January 14, 2020: [Procedural / Scheduling Order]
  • January 14, 2020: [Notice of Hearing]
  • January 14, 2020: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • January 14, 2020: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • January 14, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • January 14, 2020: [Plea Agreement]
  • January 14, 2020: [Information - Felony]
  • January 07, 2020: [Notice of Hearing]
  • January 02, 2020: [Pretrial Conference ]
  • January 02, 2020: [~Util - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
November, 2019
  • November 21, 2019: [Notice of Hearing]
  • November 08, 2019: [Pretrial Scheduling Order]
  • November 08, 2019: [Waiver of Personal Appearance at Arraignment]
  • November 08, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • November 08, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • November 07, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • November 06, 2019: [Continue]
  • November 06, 2019: [Notice of Hearing]
  • November 06, 2019: [Order Reassigning Case]
  • November 05, 2019: [Notice of Hearing]
October, 2019
  • October 31, 2019: [Indictment]
  • October 18, 2019: [Waiver of Personal Appearance at Arraignment]
  • October 16, 2019: [Notice of Hearing]
  • October 10, 2019: [Indictment]
September, 2019
  • September 30, 2019: [Pretrial Conference ]
  • September 30, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • September 05, 2019: [Waiver of Personal Appearance at Arraignment]
August, 2019
  • August 29, 2019: [Notice of Hearing]
  • August 27, 2019: [Notice of Docket Entry Correction (PDF) - (ECF Admin Only)]
  • August 27, 2019: [Notice of Hearing]
  • August 26, 2019: [Order on Motion to Exclude]
  • August 26, 2019: [Notice of Hearing]
  • August 23, 2019: [Exclude]
  • August 22, 2019: [Indictment]
July, 2019
  • July 29, 2019: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Pretrial Motions]
  • July 26, 2019: [Extension of Time to File Pretrial Motions]
  • July 23, 2019: [Search and Seizure Warrant Returned Executed]
June, 2019
  • June 10, 2019: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Pretrial Motions]
  • June 06, 2019: [Extension of Time to File Pretrial Motions]
  • June 04, 2019: [CJA 20 - Appointment]
  • June 03, 2019: [Motion Hearing]
  • June 03, 2019: [~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys]
May, 2019
  • May 13, 2019: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
April, 2019
  • April 30, 2019: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
  • April 29, 2019: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • April 02, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • April 02, 2019: [~Util - Ruling on Motions]
March, 2019
  • March 22, 2019: [Application for Search Warrant]
  • March 18, 2019: [Order Scheduling a Detention Hearing]
  • March 18, 2019: [Order]
  • March 18, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • March 18, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 18, 2019: [Notice of Appearance - Defendant]
  • March 14, 2019: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • March 13, 2019: [Order Scheduling a Detention Hearing]
  • March 13, 2019: [Pretrial Scheduling Order]
  • March 13, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 (NEF is sent - PDF is sealed)]
  • March 13, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • March 13, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • March 13, 2019: [Search and Seizure Warrant Returned Executed]
  • March 13, 2019: [Application for Search Warrant]
  • March 12, 2019: [Notice of Hearing]
  • March 12, 2019: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • March 11, 2019: [Detention]
  • March 11, 2019: [Rule 5(c)(3) Documents Received]
  • March 11, 2019: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • March 11, 2019: [Indictment Unsealed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.