U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Vermont

vermont Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Vermont
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:19-cr-00033-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Meminger et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 11, 2025: [Transfer Out/Probationer]
March, 2025
  • March 27, 2025: [Attorney Substitution]
  • March 27, 2025: [Probation Form 12B]
August, 2021
  • August 06, 2021: [Transcript]
February, 2021
  • February 26, 2021: [Transfer Out/Probationer]
January, 2021
  • January 27, 2021: [Transcript]
September, 2020
  • September 30, 2020: [Final Order of Forfeiture]
  • September 23, 2020: [Final Order of Forfeiture]
August, 2020
  • August 24, 2020: [Declaration of Publication (GOVT USE ONLY)]
July, 2020
  • July 27, 2020: [Notice of Docket Entry Correction (PDF) - (ECF Admin Only)]
  • July 15, 2020: [Judgment]
  • July 15, 2020: [Sentencing]
  • July 13, 2020: [Supplemental Document(s)]
  • July 07, 2020: [Sentencing Memorandum and Motion for Downward Departure]
  • July 07, 2020: [Downward Departure]
  • July 03, 2020: [Sentencing Memorandum]
June, 2020
  • June 23, 2020: [Judgment]
  • June 22, 2020: [Notice of Hearing]
  • June 22, 2020: [Sentencing]
  • June 19, 2020: [Video Conference Waiver]
  • June 18, 2020: [Preliminary Order of Forfeiture]
May, 2020
  • May 20, 2020: [Issuance of a Preliminary Order of Forfeiture]
  • May 15, 2020: [Notice of Hearing]
  • May 13, 2020: [Continue]
  • May 12, 2020: [Sentencing Memorandum]
  • May 08, 2020: [Sentencing Memorandum]
  • May 05, 2020: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration of Detention]
  • May 05, 2020: [Order on Motion for Release from Custody]
April, 2020
  • April 20, 2020: [Procedural / Scheduling Order]
  • April 20, 2020: [Notice of Hearing]
  • April 20, 2020: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • April 07, 2020: [Reconsideration, Review, or to Vacate Order of Detention]
  • April 07, 2020: [Release from Custody]
February, 2020
  • February 11, 2020: [Procedural / Scheduling Order]
  • February 11, 2020: [Notice of Hearing]
  • February 11, 2020: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • February 11, 2020: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • February 11, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • February 11, 2020: [~Util - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • February 11, 2020: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • February 10, 2020: [Plea Agreement]
  • February 10, 2020: [Information - Felony]
  • February 03, 2020: [Notice of Hearing]
  • February 03, 2020: [Procedural / Scheduling Order]
December, 2019
  • December 17, 2019: [Notice of Hearing]
  • December 04, 2019: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
  • December 04, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • December 03, 2019: [Continue]
November, 2019
  • November 04, 2019: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
October, 2019
  • October 28, 2019: [Notice of Hearing]
  • October 28, 2019: [Procedural / Scheduling Order]
  • October 28, 2019: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • October 28, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 28, 2019: [~Util - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • October 28, 2019: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • October 28, 2019: [Information - Felony]
  • October 23, 2019: [Notice of Hearing]
  • October 22, 2019: [Information - Felony]
  • October 22, 2019: [Plea Agreement]
  • October 15, 2019: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
July, 2019
  • July 31, 2019: [~Util - Ruling on Motions]
  • July 31, 2019: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • July 31, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • July 31, 2019: [Notice of Docket Entry Correction (ECF Admin Only)]
  • July 31, 2019: [Extension of Time to File Pretrial Motions]
  • July 30, 2019: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • July 29, 2019: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • July 17, 2019: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • July 16, 2019: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • July 02, 2019: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Pretrial Motions]
  • July 01, 2019: [Suppress]
  • July 01, 2019: [Extension of Time to File Pretrial Motions]
May, 2019
  • May 31, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • May 31, 2019: [~Util - Ruling on Motions]
  • May 31, 2019: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • May 31, 2019: [Extension of Time to File Pretrial Motions]
  • May 15, 2019: [Order on Motion to Seal (NEF is sent - Order is not sealed)]
  • May 15, 2019: [Motion Hearing]
  • May 15, 2019: [~Util - Ruling on Motions]
  • May 08, 2019: [Reconsideration ]
  • May 08, 2019: [File Under Seal (NEF is sent - Entry and PDF visible)]
  • May 08, 2019: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
  • May 02, 2019: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • May 01, 2019: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
  • May 01, 2019: [Order on Motion to File Under Seal (NEF is sent - Order is not sealed)]
April, 2019
  • April 18, 2019: [Motions Referred]
  • April 18, 2019: [File Under Seal (NEF is sent - PDF is Sealed)(COURT USE ONLY)]
  • April 18, 2019: [Reconsideration ]
March, 2019
  • March 20, 2019: [Notice of Appearance - Defendant]
  • March 13, 2019: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • March 13, 2019: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • March 13, 2019: [Pretrial Scheduling Order]
  • March 13, 2019: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • March 13, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 (NEF is sent - PDF is sealed)]
  • March 13, 2019: [Initial Appearance]
  • March 13, 2019: [~Util - Ruling on Motions]
  • March 13, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • March 13, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • March 12, 2019: [Detention]
  • March 12, 2019: [CJA 20 - Appointment]
  • March 12, 2019: [Indictment Unsealed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.