U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Vermont

vermont Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Vermont
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:19-cr-00038-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Champaine
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
June, 2022
  • June 17, 2022: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • June 10, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
January, 2022
  • January 14, 2022: [Order of Prosecutorial Obligation Under Fed. R. Crim. P. 5(f)]
  • January 14, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 (NEF is sent - PDF is sealed)]
  • January 13, 2022: [Probation Form 12]
  • January 07, 2022: [Summons Returned Executed]
December, 2021
  • December 28, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
  • December 27, 2021: [Probation Form 12]
October, 2021
  • October 05, 2021: [Judgment on Revocation]
July, 2021
  • July 07, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
March, 2021
  • March 23, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
  • March 23, 2021: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • March 01, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
February, 2021
  • February 08, 2021: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • February 08, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 (NEF is sent - PDF is sealed)]
  • February 04, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 (NEF is sent - PDF is sealed)]
  • February 04, 2021: [CJA 20 - Appointment]
January, 2021
  • January 26, 2021: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • January 19, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
  • January 07, 2021: [Probation Form 12]
October, 2019
  • October 18, 2019: [Judgment]
  • October 17, 2019: [Sentencing]
  • October 07, 2019: [Supplemental Sentencing Memorandum]
  • October 04, 2019: [Sentencing Memorandum and Motion for Downward Departure]
  • October 04, 2019: [Sentencing Memorandum]
September, 2019
  • September 03, 2019: [Order on Motion for Release from Custody]
  • September 03, 2019: [Release from Custody]
August, 2019
  • August 21, 2019: [Procedural / Scheduling Order]
  • August 21, 2019: [Notice of Hearing]
June, 2019
  • June 20, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • June 20, 2019: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • June 18, 2019: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
  • June 18, 2019: [Order]
  • June 11, 2019: [Revocation of Release]
April, 2019
  • April 22, 2019: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • April 22, 2019: [~Util - Ruling on Motions]
  • April 22, 2019: [Motion Hearing]
  • April 19, 2019: [Supplemental Document(s)]
  • April 15, 2019: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
  • April 12, 2019: [Release from Custody]
  • April 09, 2019: [Procedural / Scheduling Order]
  • April 09, 2019: [Notice of Hearing]
  • April 04, 2019: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • April 04, 2019: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • April 04, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 04, 2019: [~Util - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • April 04, 2019: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • April 03, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • April 03, 2019: [Bond Revocation Hearing]
March, 2019
  • March 29, 2019: [Order on Motion for Hearing]
  • March 29, 2019: [Notice of Hearing]
  • March 27, 2019: [Motions Referred]
  • March 27, 2019: [Hearing]
  • March 13, 2019: [Notice of Hearing]
  • March 12, 2019: [Plea Agreement]
  • March 12, 2019: [Information - Felony]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.