U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Vermont

vermont Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Vermont
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:19-cr-00041-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Wells-Cooper et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
September, 2022
  • September 09, 2022: [Receipt for Payment (criminal debt)]
August, 2022
  • August 30, 2022: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • August 29, 2022: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • August 29, 2022: [Memorandum in Support]
  • August 15, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • August 15, 2022: [Probation Form 12]
June, 2022
  • June 07, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
May, 2022
  • May 02, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
April, 2022
  • April 25, 2022: [Probation Form 12]
March, 2021
  • March 09, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 (NEF is sent - PDF is sealed)]
  • March 09, 2021: [Teleconference Waiver]
  • March 09, 2021: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
February, 2021
  • February 25, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
  • February 25, 2021: [CJA 20 - Appointment]
  • February 23, 2021: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • February 18, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
  • February 12, 2021: [Probation Form 12]
February, 2020
  • February 24, 2020: [Judgment]
  • February 24, 2020: [Sentencing]
  • February 19, 2020: [Sentencing Memorandum]
  • February 14, 2020: [Sentencing Memorandum and Motion for Downward Departure]
January, 2020
  • January 06, 2020: [Procedural / Scheduling Order]
  • January 06, 2020: [Notice of Hearing]
September, 2019
  • September 20, 2019: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • September 17, 2019: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
  • September 16, 2019: [Reconsideration, Review, or to Vacate Order of Detention]
July, 2019
  • July 24, 2019: [Procedural / Scheduling Order]
  • July 24, 2019: [Notice of Hearing]
  • July 15, 2019: [Order]
  • July 10, 2019: [Notice of Dismissal]
  • July 10, 2019: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • July 10, 2019: [~Util - Ruling on Motions]
June, 2019
  • June 18, 2019: [Vacate ]
  • June 18, 2019: [Motions Referred]
May, 2019
  • May 29, 2019: [Procedural / Scheduling Order]
  • May 29, 2019: [Notice of Hearing]
  • May 28, 2019: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • May 28, 2019: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • May 28, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 28, 2019: [~Util - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • May 28, 2019: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • May 28, 2019: [Plea Agreement]
  • May 28, 2019: [Information - Felony]
  • May 15, 2019: [Notice of Hearing]
  • May 15, 2019: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • May 15, 2019: [~Util - Ruling on Motions]
  • May 13, 2019: [Motion Hearing]
  • May 13, 2019: [~Util - Ruling on Motions]
  • May 13, 2019: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Pretrial Motions]
  • May 10, 2019: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
  • May 10, 2019: [Extension of Time to File Pretrial Motions]
  • May 10, 2019: [Order on Motion for Release from Custody]
  • May 07, 2019: [Release from Custody]
  • May 03, 2019: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
April, 2019
  • April 29, 2019: [Certificate]
  • April 26, 2019: [Order]
  • April 25, 2019: [Motions Referred]
  • April 25, 2019: [Reconsideration ]
  • April 05, 2019: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • April 05, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • April 05, 2019: [Document Unsealed]
  • April 04, 2019: [Ex Parte (Sealed - No NEF)(COURT USE ONLY)]
  • April 04, 2019: [Sealed Motion (Sealed - No NEF)(COURT USE ONLY)]
March, 2019
  • March 21, 2019: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • March 21, 2019: [Motion Hearing]
  • March 21, 2019: [~Util - Ruling on Motions]
  • March 20, 2019: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
  • March 19, 2019: [Reconsideration ]
  • March 19, 2019: [Motions Referred]
  • March 19, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • March 19, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • March 15, 2019: [Motion Hearing]
  • March 15, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • March 15, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • March 14, 2019: [Motions Referred]
  • March 14, 2019: [Release from Custody]
  • March 14, 2019: [Pretrial Scheduling Order]
  • March 14, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • March 14, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • March 14, 2019: [Notice of Hearing]
  • March 13, 2019: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.