U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Vermont

vermont Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Vermont
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:19-cr-00040-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Page
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2021
  • May 14, 2021: [Notice of Docket Entry Removal - (ECF Admin Only)]
  • May 14, 2021: [Notice of Appearance - Defendant]
April, 2020
  • April 24, 2020: [Notice of Appearance - Defendant]
November, 2019
  • November 20, 2019: [Status Conference]
  • November 20, 2019: [~Util - Ruling on Motions]
  • November 20, 2019: [~Util - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • November 15, 2019: [Plea Agreement]
  • November 01, 2019: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • November 01, 2019: [Notice of Hearing]
October, 2019
  • October 17, 2019: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
September, 2019
  • September 25, 2019: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • September 23, 2019: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • September 17, 2019: [Compel]
  • September 17, 2019: [Discovery]
July, 2019
  • July 22, 2019: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Pretrial Motions]
  • July 19, 2019: [Extension of Time to File Pretrial Motions]
  • July 19, 2019: [Attorney Substitution]
June, 2019
  • June 19, 2019: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Pretrial Motions]
  • June 17, 2019: [Extension of Time to File Pretrial Motions]
March, 2019
  • March 19, 2019: [Pretrial Scheduling Order]
  • March 19, 2019: [Waiver of Personal Appearance at Arraignment]
  • March 19, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • March 19, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • March 14, 2019: [Notice of Hearing]
  • March 13, 2019: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.