Quantcast
open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Vermont

PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Mi
Last Name
City
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Vermont
    Case Number:19-10102
    Party Name:Kathleen E. Smith
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Wolinsky, Douglas J. [Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution - No Funds]
    Date Published:April 25, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Wolinsky, Douglas J. [Hearing Not Held]
    Date Published:April 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Wolinsky, Douglas J. [none]
    Date Published:April 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Wolinsky, Douglas J. [Payment of Chapter 7 Installment Fee]
    Date Published:April 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Wolinsky, Douglas J. [BNC - Notice of Show Cause Hearing]
    Date Published:April 18, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Wolinsky, Douglas J. [Hearing (Show Cause)]
    Date Published:April 16, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Wolinsky, Douglas J. [Personal Financial Management Course Certificate]
    Date Published:April 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Wolinsky, Douglas J. [BNC - Order]
    Date Published:March 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Wolinsky, Douglas J. [BNC - Meeting of Creditors]
    Date Published:March 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Wolinsky, Douglas J. [Creditor Request for Notices (Paperless)]
    Date Published:March 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Wolinsky, Douglas J. [Meeting of Creditors]
    Date Published:March 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Wolinsky, Douglas J. [Pay Filing Fees in Installments (Application)]
    Date Published:March 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Wolinsky, Douglas J. [Pay Stubs/Advices with Cover Sheet]
    Date Published:March 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Wolinsky, Douglas J. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
    Date Published:March 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Wolinsky, Douglas J. [Pay Filing Fee in Installments (Application)]
    Date Published:March 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Wolinsky, Douglas J. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
    Date Published:March 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
    Date Published:March 14, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.vtb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?40423
Post Your Comment or Question
6 x 3 =