U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Vermont

vermont Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Vermont
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:19-cr-00046-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Ebron
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
September, 2022
  • September 07, 2022: [Probation Form 35]
December, 2020
  • December 01, 2020: [Order Releasing Collateral]
October, 2020
  • October 13, 2020: [Judgment]
  • October 13, 2020: [~Util - Terminate Parties]
  • October 09, 2020: [Sentencing]
September, 2020
  • September 03, 2020: [Procedural / Scheduling Order]
  • September 03, 2020: [Notice of Hearing]
August, 2020
  • August 26, 2020: [Attorney Substitution]
June, 2020
  • June 18, 2020: [Procedural / Scheduling Order]
  • June 18, 2020: [Notice of Hearing]
March, 2020
  • March 06, 2020: [Status Conference]
  • March 03, 2020: [Notice of Docket Entry Correction (ECF Admin Only)]
February, 2020
  • February 25, 2020: [Sentencing Memorandum]
  • February 24, 2020: [Sentencing Memorandum]
January, 2020
  • January 31, 2020: [Bond Revocation Hearing]
  • January 31, 2020: [Receipt for Payment (criminal debt)]
  • January 15, 2020: [Order on Motion for Hearing]
  • January 13, 2020: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
  • January 06, 2020: [Hearing]
November, 2019
  • November 08, 2019: [Plea Agreement]
  • November 08, 2019: [Notice of Hearing]
  • November 08, 2019: [Procedural / Scheduling Order]
  • November 08, 2019: [~Util - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • November 08, 2019: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • November 08, 2019: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • November 08, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
October, 2019
  • October 21, 2019: [Notice of Hearing]
September, 2019
  • September 19, 2019: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Pretrial Motions]
  • September 19, 2019: [Extension of Time to File Pretrial Motions]
August, 2019
  • August 20, 2019: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Pretrial Motions]
  • August 19, 2019: [Extension of Time to File Pretrial Motions]
June, 2019
  • June 19, 2019: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Pretrial Motions]
  • June 18, 2019: [Extension of Time to File Pretrial Motions]
May, 2019
  • May 30, 2019: [Search and Seizure Warrant Returned Executed]
March, 2019
  • March 29, 2019: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • March 29, 2019: [Notice of Appearance - Defendant]
  • March 27, 2019: [Application for Search Warrant]
  • March 22, 2019: [Pretrial Scheduling Order]
  • March 22, 2019: [Waiver of Personal Appearance at Arraignment]
  • March 22, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • March 22, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • March 21, 2019: [Indictment]
  • March 21, 2019: [Search and Seizure Warrant Returned Executed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.