U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Vermont

vermont Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Vermont
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:19-cr-00023-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Nobaris
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 10, 2023: [Notice of Hearing]
  • January 10, 2023: [Probation Form 12]
February, 2022
  • February 16, 2022: [Notice of Docket Entry Correction (ECF Admin Only)]
  • February 16, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Parties]
  • February 16, 2022: [Judgment]
  • February 15, 2022: [Notice of Appearance - Defendant]
  • February 14, 2022: [Sentencing]
  • February 14, 2022: [~Util - Ruling on Motions]
  • February 01, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
January, 2022
  • January 26, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum]
  • January 26, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum and Motion for Downward Departure]
  • January 13, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
October, 2021
  • October 06, 2021: [Procedural / Scheduling Order]
  • October 06, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
December, 2020
  • December 03, 2020: [Procedural / Scheduling Order]
  • December 03, 2020: [Notice of Hearing]
June, 2020
  • June 25, 2020: [Procedural / Scheduling Order]
  • June 25, 2020: [Notice of Hearing]
November, 2019
  • November 25, 2019: [Procedural / Scheduling Order]
  • November 25, 2019: [Notice of Hearing]
  • November 25, 2019: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • November 25, 2019: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • November 25, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 25, 2019: [~Util - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • November 15, 2019: [Notice of Hearing]
  • November 04, 2019: [Plea Agreement]
  • November 01, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • November 01, 2019: [Bond Revocation Hearing]
October, 2019
  • October 30, 2019: [Notice of Hearing]
  • October 28, 2019: [Notice of Hearing]
September, 2019
  • September 20, 2019: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Pretrial Motions]
  • September 19, 2019: [Extension of Time to File Pretrial Motions]
  • September 19, 2019: [Continue]
August, 2019
  • August 26, 2019: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Pretrial Motions]
  • August 23, 2019: [Extension of Time to File Pretrial Motions]
  • August 06, 2019: [Attorney Substitution]
June, 2019
  • June 21, 2019: [Pretrial Scheduling Order]
  • June 21, 2019: [Waiver of Personal Appearance at Arraignment]
  • June 14, 2019: [Notice of Hearing]
  • June 13, 2019: [Indictment]
April, 2019
  • April 09, 2019: [Notice of Appearance - Defendant]
  • April 03, 2019: [Warrant Returned Executed]
March, 2019
  • March 26, 2019: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • March 22, 2019: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • March 22, 2019: [Pretrial Scheduling Order]
  • March 22, 2019: [Initial Appearance]
  • March 22, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • March 22, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • March 22, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 (NEF is sent - PDF is sealed)]
  • March 22, 2019: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • March 22, 2019: [Indictment Unsealed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.