U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Vermont

vermont Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Vermont
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:19-cr-00045-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Raihan
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2020
  • May 15, 2020: [Judgment]
  • May 11, 2020: [Sentencing]
  • May 08, 2020: [Waiver of Personal Appearance at Hearing (non-arraignment)]
  • May 05, 2020: [Sentencing Memorandum]
February, 2020
  • February 27, 2020: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • February 06, 2020: [Procedural / Scheduling Order]
  • February 06, 2020: [Notice of Hearing]
January, 2020
  • January 28, 2020: [Procedural / Scheduling Order]
  • January 28, 2020: [Notice of Hearing]
  • January 28, 2020: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • January 28, 2020: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • January 28, 2020: [~Util - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • January 28, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • January 27, 2020: [Notice of Docket Entry Correction (PDF) - (ECF Admin Only)]
  • January 27, 2020: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • January 27, 2020: [Receipt for Payment (criminal debt)]
  • January 27, 2020: [Plea Agreement]
  • January 27, 2020: [Information - Felony]
  • January 07, 2020: [Dismiss]
  • January 03, 2020: [Notice of Docket Entry Removal - (ECF Admin Only)]
  • January 03, 2020: [Notice of Hearing]
September, 2019
  • September 10, 2019: [Motion Hearing]
  • September 10, 2019: [~Util - Ruling on Motions]
  • September 09, 2019: [Waiver (General)]
August, 2019
  • August 27, 2019: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
  • August 23, 2019: [Notice of Docket Entry Correction (PDF) - (ECF Admin Only)]
  • August 21, 2019: [Supplemental Document(s)]
  • August 16, 2019: [Miscellaneous Relief]
July, 2019
  • July 02, 2019: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Pretrial Motions]
  • July 02, 2019: [Extension of Time to File Pretrial Motions]
April, 2019
  • April 09, 2019: [Notice of Appearance - Defendant]
  • April 03, 2019: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • April 03, 2019: [Appearance Bond]
  • April 03, 2019: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • April 03, 2019: [Pretrial Scheduling Order]
  • April 03, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • April 03, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
March, 2019
  • March 27, 2019: [Notice of Hearing]
  • March 27, 2019: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • March 26, 2019: [Rule 5(c)(3) Documents Received]
  • March 25, 2019: [Indictment Unsealed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.