U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Vermont

vermont Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Vermont
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:19-cr-00047-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Kinne
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2020
  • January 22, 2020: [Judgment]
  • January 22, 2020: [Sentencing]
  • January 12, 2020: [Sentencing Memorandum]
  • January 09, 2020: [Sentencing Memorandum]
October, 2019
  • October 30, 2019: [Procedural / Scheduling Order]
  • October 30, 2019: [Notice of Hearing]
  • October 25, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • October 23, 2019: [Continue]
August, 2019
  • August 07, 2019: [Procedural / Scheduling Order]
  • August 07, 2019: [Notice of Hearing]
July, 2019
  • July 29, 2019: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • July 29, 2019: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • July 29, 2019: [~Util - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • July 25, 2019: [Plea Agreement]
  • July 10, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • July 10, 2019: [Exhibit List]
  • July 10, 2019: [Bond Revocation Hearing]
  • July 09, 2019: [Notice of Hearing]
June, 2019
  • June 28, 2019: [Notice of Hearing]
May, 2019
  • May 01, 2019: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
April, 2019
  • April 30, 2019: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • April 29, 2019: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • April 29, 2019: [Motion Hearing]
  • April 15, 2019: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
  • April 12, 2019: [Motions Referred]
  • April 12, 2019: [Hearing]
March, 2019
  • March 29, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • March 29, 2019: [Pretrial Scheduling Order]
  • March 29, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 (NEF is sent - PDF is sealed)]
  • March 29, 2019: [Initial Appearance]
  • March 29, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • March 29, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • March 29, 2019: [~Util - Ruling on Motions]
  • March 29, 2019: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • March 29, 2019: [Detention]
  • March 29, 2019: [CJA 20 - Appointment]
  • March 28, 2019: [Indictment Unsealed]
  • March 28, 2019: [Warrant Returned Executed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.