U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Vermont

vermont Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Vermont
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:19-cr-00051-3
  • Case Name: USA v. Spilman et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
July, 2021
  • July 20, 2021: [Notice of Docket Entry Removal - (ECF Admin Only)]
  • July 16, 2021: [Receipt for Payment (criminal debt)]
July, 2020
  • July 02, 2020: [Transfer Out/Probationer]
June, 2020
  • June 19, 2020: [Order Releasing Collateral]
March, 2020
  • March 06, 2020: [Judgment]
  • March 06, 2020: [Sentencing]
  • March 06, 2020: [Receipt for Payment (criminal debt)]
February, 2020
  • February 25, 2020: [Sentencing Memorandum]
  • February 25, 2020: [Judgment]
  • February 24, 2020: [Receipt for Payment (criminal debt)]
  • February 24, 2020: [Sentencing]
  • February 24, 2020: [~Util - Ruling on Motions]
  • February 18, 2020: [Sentencing Memorandum]
  • February 18, 2020: [Memorandum in Support]
  • February 13, 2020: [Sentencing Memorandum and Motion for Downward Departure]
January, 2020
  • January 17, 2020: [Procedural / Scheduling Order]
  • January 17, 2020: [Notice of Hearing]
  • January 06, 2020: [Sentencing Memorandum]
December, 2019
  • December 04, 2019: [Procedural / Scheduling Order]
  • December 04, 2019: [Notice of Hearing]
November, 2019
  • November 13, 2019: [Procedural / Scheduling Order]
  • November 12, 2019: [Notice of Hearing]
October, 2019
  • October 02, 2019: [Procedural / Scheduling Order]
  • October 02, 2019: [Notice of Hearing]
  • October 01, 2019: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • October 01, 2019: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • October 01, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 01, 2019: [~Util - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
September, 2019
  • September 05, 2019: [Order]
  • September 04, 2019: [Notice of Dismissal]
August, 2019
  • August 23, 2019: [Plea Agreement]
  • August 21, 2019: [Notice of Hearing]
  • August 07, 2019: [Procedural / Scheduling Order]
  • August 07, 2019: [Notice of Hearing]
July, 2019
  • July 25, 2019: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • July 25, 2019: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • July 25, 2019: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • July 25, 2019: [~Util - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • July 25, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
June, 2019
  • June 25, 2019: [Notice of Hearing]
  • June 24, 2019: [Plea Agreement]
May, 2019
  • May 28, 2019: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Pretrial Motions]
  • May 28, 2019: [Extension of Time to File Pretrial Motions]
April, 2019
  • April 23, 2019: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 15, 2019: [Pretrial Scheduling Order]
  • April 15, 2019: [Waiver of Personal Appearance at Arraignment]
  • April 15, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • April 15, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • April 09, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • April 09, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • April 08, 2019: [Notice of Hearing]
  • April 04, 2019: [Notice of Hearing]
  • April 02, 2019: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • April 02, 2019: [Pretrial Scheduling Order]
  • April 02, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 (NEF is sent - PDF is sealed)]
  • April 02, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • April 02, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • April 02, 2019: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
March, 2019
  • March 29, 2019: [Rule 5(c)(3) Documents Received]
  • March 28, 2019: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • March 28, 2019: [Indictment]
  • March 28, 2019: [CJA 20 - Appointment]
  • March 28, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • March 28, 2019: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • March 28, 2019: [~Util - Ruling on Motions]
  • March 28, 2019: [Initial Appearance]
  • March 28, 2019: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • March 28, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 (NEF is sent - PDF is sealed)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.