U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Vermont

vermont Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Vermont
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:19-cr-00048-1
  • Case Name: USA v. James et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2022
  • October 19, 2022: [Transfer Out/Probationer]
May, 2021
  • May 20, 2021: [Transcript]
March, 2021
  • March 02, 2021: [Judgment]
  • March 02, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Parties]
  • March 02, 2021: [Sentencing]
January, 2021
  • January 05, 2021: [Procedural / Scheduling Order]
  • January 05, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
  • January 04, 2021: [Transcript]
September, 2020
  • September 14, 2020: [Judgment]
  • September 14, 2020: [~Util - Terminate Parties]
  • September 11, 2020: [Sentencing]
  • September 10, 2020: [Document Unsealed]
  • September 10, 2020: [Order on Motion to Seal Document (Sealed - No NEF)]
  • September 04, 2020: [Sentencing Memorandum]
  • September 01, 2020: [Video Conference Waiver]
  • September 01, 2020: [Sentencing Memorandum and Motion for Downward Departure]
August, 2020
  • August 24, 2020: [Sentencing Memorandum]
  • August 21, 2020: [Sentencing Memorandum and Motion for Downward Departure]
  • August 13, 2020: [Teleconference Waiver]
July, 2020
  • July 23, 2020: [Procedural / Scheduling Order]
  • July 23, 2020: [Notice of Hearing]
  • July 02, 2020: [Procedural / Scheduling Order]
  • July 02, 2020: [Notice of Hearing]
June, 2020
  • June 25, 2020: [Receipt for Payment (criminal debt)]
  • June 23, 2020: [Procedural / Scheduling Order]
  • June 23, 2020: [Notice of Hearing]
  • June 02, 2020: [Order on Motion to Extend Time]
  • June 02, 2020: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • June 02, 2020: [Judgment]
  • June 02, 2020: [~Util - Terminate Parties]
  • June 01, 2020: [Sentencing]
May, 2020
  • May 26, 2020: [Order on Motion for Release from Custody]
  • May 22, 2020: [Sentencing Memorandum]
  • May 22, 2020: [Sentencing Memorandum and Motion for Downward Departure]
  • May 08, 2020: [Extension of Time]
  • May 08, 2020: [Withdraw as Attorney]
April, 2020
  • April 24, 2020: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • April 20, 2020: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • April 14, 2020: [Motion Hearing]
  • April 10, 2020: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
  • April 09, 2020: [Release from Custody]
  • April 08, 2020: [Waiver of Personal Appearance at Hearing (non-arraignment)]
  • April 07, 2020: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • April 03, 2020: [Notice of Docket Entry Correction (PDF) - (ECF Admin Only)]
  • April 03, 2020: [Reconsideration, Review, or to Vacate Order of Detention]
January, 2020
  • January 30, 2020: [Procedural / Scheduling Order]
  • January 30, 2020: [Notice of Hearing]
  • January 30, 2020: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • January 30, 2020: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • January 30, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • January 30, 2020: [~Util - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • January 23, 2020: [Notice of Hearing]
  • January 17, 2020: [Plea Agreement]
  • January 15, 2020: [Notice of Hearing]
December, 2019
  • December 27, 2019: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Pretrial Motions]
  • December 24, 2019: [Extension of Time to File Pretrial Motions]
  • December 09, 2019: [Procedural / Scheduling Order]
  • December 09, 2019: [Notice of Hearing]
  • December 04, 2019: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • December 04, 2019: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • December 04, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • December 04, 2019: [~Util - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • December 04, 2019: [Plea Agreement]
November, 2019
  • November 21, 2019: [Notice of Hearing]
  • November 08, 2019: [Notice of Hearing]
  • November 08, 2019: [Procedural / Scheduling Order]
  • November 08, 2019: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • November 08, 2019: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • November 08, 2019: [~Util - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • November 08, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 05, 2019: [Notice of Hearing]
October, 2019
  • October 30, 2019: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Pretrial Motions]
  • October 25, 2019: [Extension of Time to File Pretrial Motions]
  • October 22, 2019: [Information - Felony]
  • October 22, 2019: [Plea Agreement]
September, 2019
  • September 10, 2019: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • September 10, 2019: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • September 10, 2019: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Pretrial Motions]
  • September 02, 2019: [Extension of Time to File Pretrial Motions]
August, 2019
  • August 28, 2019: [Withdraw as Attorney]
July, 2019
  • July 29, 2019: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Pretrial Motions]
  • July 26, 2019: [Extension of Time to File Pretrial Motions]
  • July 09, 2019: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Pretrial Motions]
  • July 01, 2019: [Extension of Time to File Pretrial Motions]
June, 2019
  • June 28, 2019: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Pretrial Motions]
  • June 28, 2019: [Extension of Time to File Pretrial Motions]
May, 2019
  • May 03, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • May 03, 2019: [Pretrial Scheduling Order]
  • May 03, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • May 03, 2019: [~Util - Ruling on Motions]
  • May 03, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • May 02, 2019: [Detention]
  • May 02, 2019: [Notice of Hearing]
  • May 02, 2019: [CJA 20 - Appointment]
April, 2019
  • April 24, 2019: [Rule 5(c)(3) Documents Received]
  • April 17, 2019: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • April 17, 2019: [Indictment Unsealed]
  • April 04, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • April 04, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • April 04, 2019: [~Util - Ruling on Motions]
  • April 04, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 (NEF is sent - PDF is sealed)]
  • April 03, 2019: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • April 03, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • April 03, 2019: [~Util - Ruling on Motions]
  • April 02, 2019: [Order Scheduling a Detention Hearing]
  • April 02, 2019: [Pretrial Scheduling Order]
  • April 02, 2019: [Initial Appearance]
  • April 02, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • April 02, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • April 02, 2019: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • April 01, 2019: [Detention]
  • April 01, 2019: [CJA 20 - Appointment]
  • April 01, 2019: [Indictment - Redacted]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.