U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Vermont

vermont Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Vermont
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:19-cr-00011-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Grover
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
August, 2021
  • August 18, 2021: [Order on Motion for Early Termination of Probation]
  • August 05, 2021: [Early Termination of Probation/Supervised Release]
January, 2020
  • January 14, 2020: [Judgment]
  • January 13, 2020: [Sentencing]
  • January 07, 2020: [Sentencing Memorandum]
  • January 03, 2020: [Sentencing Memorandum and Motion for Downward Departure]
September, 2019
  • September 09, 2019: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • September 09, 2019: [Procedural / Scheduling Order]
  • September 09, 2019: [Notice of Hearing]
  • September 09, 2019: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • September 09, 2019: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • September 09, 2019: [~Util - Terminate Deadlines]
  • September 09, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
August, 2019
  • August 23, 2019: [Notice of Hearing]
  • August 22, 2019: [Plea Agreement]
  • August 22, 2019: [Information - Felony]
July, 2019
  • July 23, 2019: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • July 23, 2019: [~Util - Ruling on Motions]
  • July 23, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • July 16, 2019: [Extension of Time to File Pretrial Motions]
May, 2019
  • May 24, 2019: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Pretrial Motions]
  • May 23, 2019: [Extension of Time to File Pretrial Motions]
April, 2019
  • April 03, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • April 03, 2019: [Pretrial Scheduling Order]
  • April 03, 2019: [Initial Appearance]
  • April 03, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • April 03, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • April 03, 2019: [~Util - Ruling on Motions]
  • April 03, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 (NEF is sent - PDF is sealed)]
  • April 02, 2019: [Detention]
  • April 02, 2019: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • April 02, 2019: [CJA 20 - Appointment]
  • April 02, 2019: [Indictment Unsealed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.