U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Vermont

vermont Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Vermont
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:19-cr-00050-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Yule
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
September, 2020
  • September 04, 2020: [Amended Judgment]
  • September 03, 2020: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • September 03, 2020: [Miscellaneous Relief]
July, 2020
  • July 15, 2020: [Judgment]
  • July 15, 2020: [Sentencing]
  • July 15, 2020: [~Util - Ruling on Motions]
  • July 08, 2020: [Supplemental Document(s)]
  • July 08, 2020: [Sentencing Memorandum and Motion for Downward Departure]
April, 2020
  • April 16, 2020: [Notice of Hearing]
  • April 10, 2020: [Procedural / Scheduling Order]
  • April 09, 2020: [Sentencing Memorandum]
February, 2020
  • February 27, 2020: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
December, 2019
  • December 18, 2019: [Notice of Hearing]
  • December 18, 2019: [Procedural / Scheduling Order]
November, 2019
  • November 07, 2019: [Procedural / Scheduling Order]
  • November 07, 2019: [Notice of Hearing]
  • November 07, 2019: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • November 07, 2019: [~Util - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • November 07, 2019: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • November 07, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 07, 2019: [Receipt for Payment (criminal debt)]
  • November 06, 2019: [Plea Agreement]
October, 2019
  • October 11, 2019: [Notice of Hearing]
  • October 07, 2019: [Notice of Hearing]
September, 2019
  • September 05, 2019: [~Util - Ruling on Motions]
  • September 05, 2019: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • September 05, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • September 04, 2019: [Extension of Time to File Pretrial Motions]
August, 2019
  • August 08, 2019: [~Util - Ruling on Motions]
  • August 08, 2019: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • August 08, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • August 07, 2019: [Extension of Time to File Pretrial Motions]
July, 2019
  • July 08, 2019: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • July 08, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • July 08, 2019: [~Util - Ruling on Motions]
  • July 02, 2019: [Extension of Time to File Pretrial Motions]
June, 2019
  • June 17, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 (NEF is sent - PDF is sealed)]
April, 2019
  • April 10, 2019: [Notice of Appearance - Defendant]
  • April 04, 2019: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • April 04, 2019: [Pretrial Scheduling Order]
  • April 04, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 (NEF is sent - PDF is sealed)]
  • April 04, 2019: [Initial Appearance]
  • April 04, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • April 04, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • April 04, 2019: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • April 03, 2019: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • April 03, 2019: [Indictment Unsealed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.