U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Vermont

vermont Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Vermont
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:19-cr-00043-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Wright
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 02, 2022: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • November 02, 2022: [Order]
  • November 02, 2022: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
October, 2022
  • October 20, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
August, 2022
  • August 30, 2022: [Notice of Docket Entry Correction (PDF)]
  • August 29, 2022: [Affidavit]
May, 2022
  • May 27, 2022: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • May 27, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 (NEF is sent - PDF is sealed)]
  • May 23, 2022: [Probation Form 12]
  • May 05, 2022: [Attorney Substitution]
  • May 05, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • May 05, 2022: [Probation Form 12]
November, 2020
  • November 16, 2020: [Judgment]
  • November 16, 2020: [~Util - Terminate Parties]
  • November 13, 2020: [Sentencing]
  • November 13, 2020: [Supplemental Sentencing Memorandum]
  • November 09, 2020: [Supplemental Sentencing Memorandum]
  • November 04, 2020: [Sentencing Memorandum]
  • November 03, 2020: [Sentencing Memorandum]
July, 2020
  • July 16, 2020: [Procedural / Scheduling Order]
  • July 16, 2020: [Notice of Hearing]
  • July 13, 2020: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • July 13, 2020: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • July 13, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
June, 2020
  • June 29, 2020: [Notice of Hearing]
  • June 29, 2020: [Plea Agreement]
  • June 29, 2020: [Information - Felony]
  • June 18, 2020: [Notice of Hearing]
  • June 05, 2020: [Status Conference]
  • June 05, 2020: [~Util - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • June 02, 2020: [Notice of Hearing]
April, 2020
  • April 15, 2020: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
March, 2020
  • March 24, 2020: [Order]
  • March 24, 2020: [Motions No Longer Referred]
  • March 23, 2020: [Notice of Docket Entry Correction (PDF) - (ECF Admin Only)]
  • March 23, 2020: [Release from Custody]
February, 2020
  • February 25, 2020: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • February 12, 2020: [Exhibit List]
  • February 12, 2020: [Order of Competency to Stand Trial]
January, 2020
  • January 30, 2020: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
  • January 30, 2020: [Order on Motion to Seal (NEF is sent - Order is not sealed)]
  • January 30, 2020: [Order on Motion to File Under Seal (NEF is sent - Order is not sealed)]
  • January 27, 2020: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • January 17, 2020: [Motions Referred]
December, 2019
  • December 05, 2019: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Pretrial Motions]
  • December 04, 2019: [Extension of Time to File Pretrial Motions]
November, 2019
  • November 26, 2019: [Order on Motion for Psychiatric Exam]
  • November 21, 2019: [Psychiatric Exam]
October, 2019
  • October 09, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • October 09, 2019: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • October 08, 2019: [Order on Motion to Seal Document (Sealed - No NEF)]
  • October 08, 2019: [Order on Sealed Motion (Sealed - No NEF)]
September, 2019
  • September 30, 2019: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Pretrial Motions]
  • September 30, 2019: [Extension of Time to File Pretrial Motions]
August, 2019
  • August 20, 2019: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Pretrial Motions]
  • August 19, 2019: [Extension of Time to File Pretrial Motions]
July, 2019
  • July 16, 2019: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Pretrial Motions]
  • July 15, 2019: [Extension of Time to File Pretrial Motions]
June, 2019
  • June 17, 2019: [Search and Seizure Warrant Returned Executed]
May, 2019
  • May 17, 2019: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • May 17, 2019: [Motion Hearing]
  • May 16, 2019: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
  • May 06, 2019: [Release from Custody]
April, 2019
  • April 23, 2019: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • April 23, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • April 23, 2019: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • April 22, 2019: [Document Unsealed]
  • April 18, 2019: [Notice of Appearance - Defendant]
  • April 08, 2019: [Notice of Docket Entry Correction (PDF) - (ECF Admin Only)]
  • April 08, 2019: [Supplemental Document(s)]
  • April 08, 2019: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • April 08, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • April 08, 2019: [~Util - Ruling on Motions]
  • April 08, 2019: [Attorney Appointment Hearing]
  • April 08, 2019: [Not a motion]
  • April 05, 2019: [Application for Search Warrant]
  • April 04, 2019: [Order Scheduling a Detention Hearing]
  • April 04, 2019: [Pretrial Scheduling Order]
  • April 04, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 (NEF is sent - PDF is sealed)]
  • April 04, 2019: [Initial Appearance]
  • April 04, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • April 04, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • April 03, 2019: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • April 03, 2019: [CJA 20 - Appointment]
  • April 03, 2019: [Notice of Docket Entry Correction (PDF) - (ECF Admin Only)]
  • April 03, 2019: [Detention]
  • April 03, 2019: [Indictment Unsealed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.