U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Vermont

vermont Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Vermont
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:19-cr-00053-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Thomas
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2022
  • January 03, 2022: [Notice of Docket Entry Correction (PDF) - (ECF Admin Only)]
December, 2021
  • December 29, 2021: [Amended Judgment]
  • December 08, 2021: [Judgment]
  • December 06, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • December 06, 2021: [Sentencing]
  • December 06, 2021: [~Util - Ruling on Motions]
  • December 01, 2021: [Notice of Docket Entry Correction (PDF) - (ECF Admin Only)]
November, 2021
  • November 30, 2021: [Sentencing Memorandum and Motion for Downward Departure]
  • November 24, 2021: [Sentencing Memorandum and Motion for Downward Departure]
October, 2021
  • October 19, 2021: [Procedural / Scheduling Order]
  • October 19, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
June, 2021
  • June 30, 2021: [Procedural / Scheduling Order]
  • June 30, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
  • June 29, 2021: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • June 25, 2021: [Notice of Appearance - Defendant]
February, 2020
  • February 03, 2020: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
January, 2020
  • January 31, 2020: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • January 21, 2020: [Procedural / Scheduling Order]
  • January 21, 2020: [Notice of Hearing]
June, 2019
  • June 04, 2019: [Notice of Appearance - Defendant]
May, 2019
  • May 14, 2019: [Notice of Appearance - Defendant]
  • May 03, 2019: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • May 03, 2019: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • May 03, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 (NEF is sent - PDF is sealed)]
  • May 03, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • May 03, 2019: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • May 03, 2019: [Receipt for Payment (criminal debt)]
April, 2019
  • April 09, 2019: [Notice of Hearing]
  • April 03, 2019: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • April 03, 2019: [Plea Agreement]
  • April 03, 2019: [Information - Felony]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.