U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Vermont

vermont Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Vermont
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:19-cr-00042-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Smith
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
November, 2021
  • November 30, 2021: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • November 30, 2021: [Dismiss]
June, 2021
  • June 28, 2021: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • June 28, 2021: [Notice of Appearance - Defendant]
February, 2021
  • February 16, 2021: [Transcript]
  • February 04, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • February 04, 2021: [Continue]
January, 2021
  • January 11, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
December, 2020
  • December 16, 2020: [Judgment]
  • December 14, 2020: [Sentencing]
  • December 14, 2020: [Video Conference Waiver]
  • December 14, 2020: [Supplemental Document(s)]
  • December 09, 2020: [Notice of Hearing]
  • December 04, 2020: [Sentencing Memorandum]
November, 2020
  • November 23, 2020: [Sentencing Memorandum and Motion for Downward Departure]
  • November 17, 2020: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • November 17, 2020: [Continue]
October, 2020
  • October 26, 2020: [Procedural / Scheduling Order]
  • October 16, 2020: [Notice of Hearing]
September, 2020
  • September 18, 2020: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Pretrial Motions]
  • September 14, 2020: [Extension of Time to File Pretrial Motions]
July, 2020
  • July 14, 2020: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 (NEF is sent - PDF is sealed)]
  • July 13, 2020: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
June, 2020
  • June 15, 2020: [Pretrial Scheduling Order]
  • June 15, 2020: [Teleconference Waiver]
  • June 15, 2020: [Arraignment]
  • June 15, 2020: [Initial Appearance]
  • June 15, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
May, 2020
  • May 29, 2020: [Notice of Docket Entry Correction (PDF) - (ECF Admin Only)]
  • May 18, 2020: [Notice of Appearance - Defendant]
  • May 08, 2020: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • May 05, 2020: [Notice of Hearing]
  • May 04, 2020: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • May 04, 2020: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • May 04, 2020: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • May 04, 2020: [Continue]
  • May 04, 2020: [Appoint Counsel]
April, 2020
  • April 02, 2020: [Continue]
March, 2020
  • March 23, 2020: [Notice of Hearing]
  • March 20, 2020: [Information - ALL Misdemeanor]
February, 2020
  • February 06, 2020: [Procedural / Scheduling Order]
  • February 06, 2020: [Notice of Hearing]
January, 2020
  • January 08, 2020: [Procedural / Scheduling Order]
  • January 08, 2020: [Notice of Hearing]
  • January 07, 2020: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • January 07, 2020: [Continue]
November, 2019
  • November 04, 2019: [Procedural / Scheduling Order]
  • November 04, 2019: [Notice of Hearing]
  • November 04, 2019: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • November 04, 2019: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • November 04, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 04, 2019: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • November 04, 2019: [Information - Felony]
  • November 04, 2019: [Plea Agreement]
October, 2019
  • October 28, 2019: [Notice of Hearing]
  • October 09, 2019: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
  • October 01, 2019: [Notice (Other)]
September, 2019
  • September 30, 2019: [Response to Motion]
  • September 23, 2019: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
August, 2019
  • August 23, 2019: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • August 19, 2019: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • August 08, 2019: [Notice of Docket Entry Correction (PDF) - (ECF Admin Only)]
  • August 07, 2019: [Suppress]
  • August 07, 2019: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • August 07, 2019: [~Util - Ruling on Motions]
  • August 07, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • August 02, 2019: [Extension of Time to File Pretrial Motions]
July, 2019
  • July 02, 2019: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Pretrial Motions]
  • July 02, 2019: [Extension of Time to File Pretrial Motions]
June, 2019
  • June 03, 2019: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Pretrial Motions]
  • June 03, 2019: [Extension of Time to File Pretrial Motions]
April, 2019
  • April 09, 2019: [Notice of Appearance - Defendant]
  • April 04, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • April 04, 2019: [Pretrial Scheduling Order]
  • April 04, 2019: [Initial Appearance]
  • April 04, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • April 04, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • April 04, 2019: [~Util - Ruling on Motions]
  • April 04, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 (NEF is sent - PDF is sealed)]
  • April 04, 2019: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • April 04, 2019: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • April 04, 2019: [Detention]
  • April 04, 2019: [Indictment Unsealed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.