U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Vermont

vermont Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Vermont
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:19-cr-00052-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Rougeau
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2019
  • December 04, 2019: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • December 02, 2019: [Judgment]
  • December 02, 2019: [Sentencing]
November, 2019
  • November 26, 2019: [Notice of Docket Entry Correction (ECF Admin Only)]
  • November 26, 2019: [Sentencing Memorandum and Motion for Downward Departure]
  • November 22, 2019: [Sentencing Memorandum]
August, 2019
  • August 20, 2019: [Procedural / Scheduling Order]
  • August 20, 2019: [Notice of Hearing]
  • August 20, 2019: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • August 20, 2019: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • August 20, 2019: [~Util - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • August 20, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 20, 2019: [Plea Agreement]
  • August 19, 2019: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • August 19, 2019: [Information - Felony]
July, 2019
  • July 18, 2019: [Notice of Hearing]
June, 2019
  • June 17, 2019: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Pretrial Motions]
  • June 14, 2019: [Extension of Time to File Pretrial Motions]
  • June 13, 2019: [Notice of Appearance - Defendant]
April, 2019
  • April 16, 2019: [Notice of Docket Entry Correction (PDF) - (ECF Admin Only)]
  • April 15, 2019: [Pretrial Scheduling Order]
  • April 15, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • April 15, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 (NEF is sent - PDF is sealed)]
  • April 15, 2019: [~Util - Ruling on Motions]
  • April 15, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • April 15, 2019: [Initial Appearance]
  • April 15, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • April 11, 2019: [Detention]
  • April 05, 2019: [Notice of Hearing]
  • April 05, 2019: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.