U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Vermont

vermont Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Vermont
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:19-cr-00055-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Griffin et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 24, 2023: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • January 23, 2023: [Order of Prosecutorial Obligation Under Fed. R. Crim. P. 5(f)]
  • January 20, 2023: [Notice of Hearing]
June, 2022
  • June 15, 2022: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • June 13, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
April, 2022
  • April 18, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • April 06, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
March, 2022
  • March 22, 2022: [Notice of Appearance - Defendant]
  • March 17, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • March 16, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 (NEF is sent - PDF is sealed)]
  • March 15, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • March 15, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
January, 2022
  • January 24, 2022: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • January 24, 2022: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • January 13, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
December, 2021
  • December 21, 2021: [Preliminary Revocation Hearing]
  • December 17, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
November, 2021
  • November 17, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • November 15, 2021: [Order of Prosecutorial Obligation Under Fed. R. Crim. P. 5(f)]
  • November 15, 2021: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • November 15, 2021: [Video Conference Waiver]
  • November 15, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
  • November 15, 2021: [Document Unsealed]
July, 2021
  • July 20, 2021: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
May, 2021
  • May 07, 2021: [Video Conference Waiver]
April, 2021
  • April 15, 2021: [Notice of Docket Entry Correction (PDF) - (ECF Admin Only)]
  • April 12, 2021: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • April 09, 2021: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • April 09, 2021: [Receipt for Payment (criminal debt)]
March, 2021
  • March 23, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
  • March 23, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • March 22, 2021: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • March 22, 2021: [Teleconference Waiver]
  • March 09, 2021: [Judgment]
  • March 09, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Parties]
  • March 09, 2021: [Sentencing]
  • March 08, 2021: [Sentencing Memorandum]
  • March 05, 2021: [Sentencing Memorandum and Motion for Downward Departure]
February, 2021
  • February 25, 2021: [Procedural / Scheduling Order]
  • February 25, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
January, 2021
  • January 07, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • January 05, 2021: [Notice of Docket Entry Correction (PDF) - (ECF Admin Only)]
  • January 04, 2021: [Video Conference Waiver]
December, 2020
  • December 15, 2020: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • December 11, 2020: [Video Conference Waiver]
  • December 10, 2020: [Notice of Hearing]
  • December 10, 2020: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • December 01, 2020: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
November, 2020
  • November 24, 2020: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • November 24, 2020: [Revocation of Release]
  • November 05, 2020: [Notice of Hearing]
October, 2020
  • October 16, 2020: [Attorney Substitution]
September, 2020
  • September 18, 2020: [Attorney Substitution]
  • September 10, 2020: [Judgment]
  • September 08, 2020: [Notice of Hearing]
August, 2020
  • August 24, 2020: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • August 21, 2020: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
  • August 17, 2020: [Order]
  • August 17, 2020: [Reconsideration, Review, or to Vacate Order of Detention]
  • August 11, 2020: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • August 05, 2020: [Video Conference Waiver]
  • August 03, 2020: [Notice of Hearing]
  • August 03, 2020: [Sentencing]
July, 2020
  • July 31, 2020: [Notice of Docket Entry Correction (ECF Admin Only)]
  • July 30, 2020: [Sentencing Memorandum]
  • July 30, 2020: [Sentencing Memorandum and Motion for Downward Departure]
  • July 22, 2020: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • July 22, 2020: [Teleconference Waiver]
  • July 22, 2020: [Order of Detention]
  • July 21, 2020: [~Util - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • July 20, 2020: [Notice of Docket Entry Correction (PDF) - (ECF Admin Only)]
  • July 20, 2020: [Document Unsealed]
  • July 19, 2020: [Notice of Hearing]
  • July 16, 2020: [Teleconference Waiver]
  • July 15, 2020: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
  • July 14, 2020: [Reconsideration, Review, or to Vacate Order of Detention]
  • July 13, 2020: [Teleconference Waiver]
  • July 13, 2020: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
  • July 13, 2020: [Motions No Longer Referred]
  • July 13, 2020: [Motions Referred]
  • July 10, 2020: [Reconsideration, Review, or to Vacate Order of Detention]
  • July 10, 2020: [Notice of Hearing]
June, 2020
  • June 30, 2020: [Status Conference]
  • June 22, 2020: [Teleconference Waiver]
  • June 18, 2020: [Notice of Docket Entry Correction (PDF) - (ECF Admin Only)]
  • June 17, 2020: [Notice of Hearing]
  • June 17, 2020: [Notice of Docket Entry Removal - (ECF Admin Only)]
  • June 16, 2020: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • June 12, 2020: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 (NEF is sent - PDF is sealed)]
  • June 12, 2020: [Teleconference Waiver]
  • June 12, 2020: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • June 12, 2020: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • June 11, 2020: [Notice of Hearing]
  • June 11, 2020: [Document Unsealed]
  • June 11, 2020: [Probation Form 12 (Sealed - No NEF)]
March, 2020
  • March 30, 2020: [Notice of Docket Entry Correction (PDF) - (ECF Admin Only)]
  • March 30, 2020: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • March 12, 2020: [Judgment]
  • March 10, 2020: [Sentencing]
February, 2020
  • February 28, 2020: [Sentencing Memorandum and Motion for Downward Departure]
  • February 25, 2020: [Sentencing Memorandum]
January, 2020
  • January 30, 2020: [Bond Revocation Hearing]
  • January 28, 2020: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • January 28, 2020: [Notice of Hearing]
  • January 02, 2020: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • January 02, 2020: [Bond Revocation Hearing]
December, 2019
  • December 30, 2019: [Notice of Hearing]
  • December 23, 2019: [Reentry Drug Court Proceedings]
  • December 17, 2019: [Notice of Hearing]
  • December 12, 2019: [CJA 20 - Appointment]
  • December 12, 2019: [Order]
  • December 12, 2019: [~Util - Ruling on Motions]
  • December 12, 2019: [~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • December 11, 2019: [Refer to Drug Court]
November, 2019
  • November 26, 2019: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • November 15, 2019: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
  • November 15, 2019: [Order on Motion to Seal (NEF is sent - Order is not sealed)]
  • November 14, 2019: [Notice of Docket Entry Correction (ECF Admin Only)]
  • November 14, 2019: [File Under Seal (NEF is sent - Entry and PDF visible)]
  • November 14, 2019: [Reconsideration, Review, or to Vacate Order of Detention]
  • November 12, 2019: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • November 12, 2019: [Motion Hearing]
  • November 08, 2019: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
  • November 06, 2019: [Reconsideration, Review, or to Vacate Order of Detention]
October, 2019
  • October 28, 2019: [Procedural / Scheduling Order]
  • October 28, 2019: [Notice of Hearing]
  • October 28, 2019: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • October 28, 2019: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • October 28, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 28, 2019: [~Util - Terminate Deadlines]
  • October 21, 2019: [Plea Agreement]
  • October 18, 2019: [Plea Agreement]
  • October 15, 2019: [Notice of Hearing]
  • October 11, 2019: [Reentry Drug Court Proceedings]
September, 2019
  • September 27, 2019: [Order on Motion to Refer Defendant to Drug Court]
  • September 27, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • September 27, 2019: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • September 27, 2019: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • September 26, 2019: [Refer to Drug Court]
  • September 26, 2019: [Continue]
  • September 24, 2019: [Notice of Hearing]
  • September 19, 2019: [Plea Agreement]
August, 2019
  • August 16, 2019: [~Util - Ruling on Motions]
  • August 16, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • August 16, 2019: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • August 07, 2019: [Extension of Time to File Pretrial Motions]
July, 2019
  • July 09, 2019: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • July 09, 2019: [~Util - Ruling on Motions]
  • July 09, 2019: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • July 09, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • July 08, 2019: [Extension of Time to File Pretrial Motions]
May, 2019
  • May 21, 2019: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • May 17, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • May 14, 2019: [Order on Motion for Warrant]
  • May 14, 2019: [Revocation of Release]
  • May 14, 2019: [Warrant]
  • May 13, 2019: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • May 13, 2019: [Motion Hearing]
  • May 07, 2019: [File Under Seal (NEF is sent - Entry and PDF visible)]
  • May 07, 2019: [Reconsideration ]
  • May 07, 2019: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration ]
  • May 07, 2019: [Order on Motion to File Under Seal (NEF is sent - Order is not sealed)]
  • May 03, 2019: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
  • May 02, 2019: [Motions Referred]
  • May 02, 2019: [File Under Seal (NEF is sent - PDF is Sealed)(COURT USE ONLY)]
  • May 02, 2019: [Reconsideration ]
April, 2019
  • April 30, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • April 30, 2019: [Pretrial Scheduling Order]
  • April 30, 2019: [Initial Appearance]
  • April 30, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • April 30, 2019: [~Util - Ruling on Motions]
  • April 30, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • April 30, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 (NEF is sent - PDF is sealed)]
  • April 29, 2019: [Detention]
  • April 17, 2019: [Notice of Hearing]
  • April 17, 2019: [CJA 20 - Appointment]
  • April 11, 2019: [Notice of Docket Entry Correction (PDF) - (ECF Admin Only)]
  • April 10, 2019: [Notice of Appearance - Defendant]
  • April 10, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • April 10, 2019: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • April 10, 2019: [Exhibit List]
  • April 10, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • April 10, 2019: [~Util - Ruling on Motions]
  • April 09, 2019: [Request for Writ]
  • April 09, 2019: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • April 08, 2019: [Order Scheduling a Detention Hearing]
  • April 08, 2019: [Pretrial Scheduling Order]
  • April 08, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 (NEF is sent - PDF is sealed)]
  • April 08, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • April 08, 2019: [Initial Appearance]
  • April 08, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • April 08, 2019: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • April 08, 2019: [CJA 20 - Appointment]
  • April 08, 2019: [Detention]
  • April 08, 2019: [Indictment Unsealed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.