U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Vermont

vermont Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Vermont
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:19-cr-00057-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Hernandez
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
November, 2021
  • November 10, 2021: [Transfer Out/Probationer]
April, 2020
  • April 01, 2020: [Judgment]
  • April 01, 2020: [~Util - Terminate Parties]
  • April 01, 2020: [Sentencing]
March, 2020
  • March 31, 2020: [Order]
  • March 30, 2020: [Notice of Hearing]
  • March 27, 2020: [Order]
  • March 23, 2020: [Supplemental Sentencing Memorandum]
  • March 12, 2020: [Status Conference]
  • March 12, 2020: [~Util - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • March 10, 2020: [Receipt for Payment (criminal debt)]
  • March 07, 2020: [Sentencing Memorandum and Motion for Downward Departure]
  • March 02, 2020: [Sentencing Memorandum]
February, 2020
  • February 03, 2020: [Search and Seizure Warrant Returned Executed]
November, 2019
  • November 14, 2019: [Procedural / Scheduling Order]
  • November 14, 2019: [Notice of Hearing]
  • November 12, 2019: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • November 12, 2019: [Waiver of Indictment]
October, 2019
  • October 15, 2019: [Notice of Hearing]
  • October 10, 2019: [Plea Agreement]
  • October 10, 2019: [Information - Felony]
  • October 01, 2019: [Sur-Reply to Motion]
September, 2019
  • September 17, 2019: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • September 17, 2019: [Continue]
August, 2019
  • August 21, 2019: [~Util - Ruling on Motions]
  • August 21, 2019: [Order]
  • August 21, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • August 21, 2019: [~Util - Terminate Hearings]
  • August 20, 2019: [Extension of Time]
  • August 20, 2019: [Continue]
  • August 06, 2019: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
July, 2019
  • July 29, 2019: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • July 11, 2019: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • July 10, 2019: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • July 01, 2019: [Suppress]
June, 2019
  • June 19, 2019: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Pretrial Motions]
  • June 17, 2019: [Extension of Time to File Pretrial Motions]
May, 2019
  • May 22, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • May 22, 2019: [Motion Hearing]
  • May 22, 2019: [~Util - Ruling on Motions]
  • May 21, 2019: [Search and Seizure Warrant Returned Executed]
  • May 21, 2019: [Memorandum in Support]
  • May 17, 2019: [Rule 5(c)(3) Documents Received]
  • May 14, 2019: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
  • May 13, 2019: [Order]
  • May 13, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 13, 2019: [Document Unsealed]
  • May 13, 2019: [Warrant Returned Executed]
April, 2019
  • April 26, 2019: [Notice of Docket Entry Correction (PDF) - (ECF Admin Only)]
  • April 25, 2019: [Application for Search Warrant]
  • April 16, 2019: [Pretrial Scheduling Order]
  • April 16, 2019: [Waiver of Personal Appearance at Arraignment]
  • April 16, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • April 16, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • April 10, 2019: [Notice of Appearance - Defendant]
  • April 10, 2019: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • April 10, 2019: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.