U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Vermont

vermont Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Vermont
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:19-cr-00058-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Smith
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
July, 2020
  • July 10, 2020: [Motion Hearing]
June, 2020
  • June 22, 2020: [Order on Motion to Seal (NEF is sent - Order is not sealed)]
  • June 19, 2020: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • June 19, 2020: [File Under Seal (NEF is sent - Entry and PDF visible)]
  • June 19, 2020: [Notice (Other)]
  • June 12, 2020: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
  • June 05, 2020: [Compassionate Release]
April, 2020
  • April 28, 2020: [Notice of Docket Entry Correction (PDF) - (ECF Admin Only)]
  • April 28, 2020: [Notice of Appearance - Defendant]
March, 2020
  • March 13, 2020: [Order Releasing Collateral]
December, 2019
  • December 20, 2019: [Judgment]
  • December 20, 2019: [Sentencing]
  • December 20, 2019: [~Util - Ruling on Motions]
  • December 19, 2019: [Supplemental Document(s)]
  • December 19, 2019: [Reply]
  • December 17, 2019: [Sentencing Memorandum]
  • December 16, 2019: [Sentencing Memorandum and Motion for Downward Departure]
November, 2019
  • November 14, 2019: [Order on Motion to Seal (NEF is sent - Order is not sealed)]
  • November 14, 2019: [File Under Seal (NEF is sent - Entry and PDF visible)]
  • November 14, 2019: [Notice (Other)]
September, 2019
  • September 04, 2019: [Procedural / Scheduling Order]
  • September 04, 2019: [Notice of Hearing]
August, 2019
  • August 28, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 28, 2019: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • August 28, 2019: [~Util - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • August 28, 2019: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • August 27, 2019: [Receipt for Payment (criminal debt)]
  • August 06, 2019: [Notice of Hearing]
July, 2019
  • July 30, 2019: [Plea Agreement]
  • July 18, 2019: [Document Unsealed]
  • July 18, 2019: [Order on Motion to Unseal Document ]
  • July 16, 2019: [Unseal Document (Court use only)]
  • July 16, 2019: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Pretrial Motions]
  • July 15, 2019: [Extension of Time to File Pretrial Motions]
April, 2019
  • April 25, 2019: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 23, 2019: [Search and Seizure Warrant Returned Executed]
  • April 18, 2019: [Notice of Docket Entry Correction (PDF) - (ECF Admin Only)]
  • April 16, 2019: [Pretrial Scheduling Order]
  • April 16, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • April 16, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • April 10, 2019: [Notice of Appearance - Defendant]
  • April 10, 2019: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.