U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Vermont

vermont Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Vermont
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:19-cr-00063-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Moody
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
June, 2020
  • June 04, 2020: [Transcript]
May, 2020
  • May 19, 2020: [Search and Seizure Warrant Returned Executed]
  • May 05, 2020: [Judgment]
  • May 05, 2020: [Sentencing]
  • May 05, 2020: [~Util - Ruling on Motions]
April, 2020
  • April 30, 2020: [Waiver of Personal Appearance at Hearing (non-arraignment)]
  • April 30, 2020: [Notice of Hearing]
  • April 28, 2020: [Sentencing Memorandum and Motion for Downward Departure]
  • April 24, 2020: [Sentencing Memorandum]
January, 2020
  • January 22, 2020: [Search and Seizure Warrant Returned Executed]
  • January 14, 2020: [Procedural / Scheduling Order]
  • January 14, 2020: [Notice of Hearing]
  • January 14, 2020: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • January 13, 2020: [Continue]
October, 2019
  • October 11, 2019: [Procedural / Scheduling Order]
  • October 11, 2019: [Notice of Hearing]
  • October 11, 2019: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • October 11, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 11, 2019: [~Util - Plea Entered]
September, 2019
  • September 20, 2019: [Notice of Hearing]
  • September 17, 2019: [Plea Agreement]
August, 2019
  • August 16, 2019: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • August 16, 2019: [~Util - Ruling on Motions]
  • August 16, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • August 14, 2019: [Extension of Time to File Pretrial Motions]
  • August 07, 2019: [Search and Seizure Warrant Returned Executed]
July, 2019
  • July 16, 2019: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • July 16, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • July 16, 2019: [~Util - Ruling on Motions]
  • July 16, 2019: [Extension of Time to File Pretrial Motions]
  • July 02, 2019: [Order on Motion for Release from Custody]
  • July 02, 2019: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • July 01, 2019: [Response to Motion]
  • July 01, 2019: [Release from Custody]
  • July 01, 2019: [Miscellaneous Relief]
May, 2019
  • May 23, 2019: [Application for Search Warrant]
  • May 07, 2019: [Application for Search Warrant]
April, 2019
  • April 16, 2019: [Pretrial Scheduling Order]
  • April 16, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • April 16, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • April 12, 2019: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • April 11, 2019: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.