U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Vermont

vermont Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Vermont
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:19-cr-00062-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Mohamed
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
June, 2021
  • June 16, 2021: [Receipt for Payment (criminal debt)]
April, 2021
  • April 15, 2021: [Judgment]
  • April 14, 2021: [Sentencing]
  • April 07, 2021: [Video Conference Waiver]
  • April 07, 2021: [Notice of Docket Entry Correction (PDF) - (ECF Admin Only)]
  • April 06, 2021: [Sentencing Memorandum]
  • April 02, 2021: [Sentencing Memorandum]
February, 2021
  • February 25, 2021: [Procedural / Scheduling Order]
  • February 25, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
January, 2021
  • January 08, 2021: [Status Conference]
  • January 04, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
December, 2020
  • December 16, 2020: [Procedural / Scheduling Order]
  • December 16, 2020: [Notice of Hearing]
January, 2020
  • January 03, 2020: [~Util - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • January 03, 2020: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • January 03, 2020: [Information - ALL Misdemeanor]
December, 2019
  • December 16, 2019: [Notice of Hearing]
  • December 16, 2019: [Plea Agreement]
  • December 05, 2019: [Notice (Other)]
October, 2019
  • October 24, 2019: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Pretrial Motions]
  • October 23, 2019: [Extension of Time to File Pretrial Motions]
September, 2019
  • September 27, 2019: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Pretrial Motions]
  • September 24, 2019: [Notice of Docket Entry Correction (PDF) - (ECF Admin Only)]
  • September 24, 2019: [Extension of Time to File Pretrial Motions]
August, 2019
  • August 26, 2019: [Notice of Docket Entry Correction (PDF) - (ECF Admin Only)]
  • August 26, 2019: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Pretrial Motions]
  • August 23, 2019: [Extension of Time to File Pretrial Motions]
July, 2019
  • July 12, 2019: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Pretrial Motions]
  • July 11, 2019: [Notice of Appearance - Defendant]
  • July 11, 2019: [Extension of Time to File Pretrial Motions]
June, 2019
  • June 11, 2019: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Pretrial Motions]
  • June 10, 2019: [Extension of Time to File Pretrial Motions]
April, 2019
  • April 26, 2019: [Notice of Appearance - Defendant]
  • April 12, 2019: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • April 12, 2019: [Pretrial Scheduling Order]
  • April 12, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 (NEF is sent - PDF is sealed)]
  • April 12, 2019: [Initial Appearance]
  • April 12, 2019: [~Util - Ruling on Motions]
  • April 12, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • April 12, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • April 12, 2019: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • April 11, 2019: [Detention]
  • April 11, 2019: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.