U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Vermont

vermont Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Vermont
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:19-cr-00059-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Pryor et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
November, 2021
  • November 03, 2021: [Order]
  • November 01, 2021: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • November 01, 2021: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
October, 2021
  • October 19, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
August, 2021
  • August 26, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
April, 2021
  • April 21, 2021: [Probation Form 12]
March, 2021
  • March 18, 2021: [Notice of Appearance - Defendant]
  • March 09, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • March 09, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 (NEF is sent - PDF is sealed)]
  • March 09, 2021: [Video Conference Waiver]
  • March 09, 2021: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • March 09, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • March 08, 2021: [Probation Form 12 (Sealed - No NEF)]
September, 2020
  • September 21, 2020: [Judgment]
  • September 21, 2020: [~Util - Terminate Parties]
  • September 18, 2020: [Sentencing]
  • September 17, 2020: [Statement by Defendant re: Presentence Report]
  • September 14, 2020: [Sentencing Memorandum]
  • September 13, 2020: [Sentencing Memorandum and Motion for Downward Departure]
  • September 13, 2020: [Downward Departure]
July, 2020
  • July 31, 2020: [Procedural / Scheduling Order]
  • July 31, 2020: [Notice of Hearing]
  • July 23, 2020: [Procedural / Scheduling Order]
  • July 23, 2020: [Notice of Hearing]
June, 2020
  • June 25, 2020: [Receipt for Payment (criminal debt)]
  • June 12, 2020: [Judgment]
  • June 12, 2020: [Plea and Sentence]
  • June 10, 2020: [Sentencing Memorandum]
  • June 09, 2020: [Sentencing Memorandum]
  • June 05, 2020: [Notice of Hearing]
February, 2020
  • February 21, 2020: [Notice of Hearing]
  • February 13, 2020: [Procedural / Scheduling Order]
  • February 13, 2020: [Notice of Hearing]
  • February 13, 2020: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • February 13, 2020: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • February 13, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • February 13, 2020: [~Util - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
January, 2020
  • January 29, 2020: [Notice of Hearing]
  • January 23, 2020: [Judgment]
  • January 23, 2020: [~Util - Terminate Parties]
  • January 22, 2020: [Sentencing]
  • January 21, 2020: [Supplemental Document(s)]
  • January 21, 2020: [Plea Agreement]
  • January 21, 2020: [Information - Felony]
  • January 21, 2020: [Notice of Hearing]
  • January 17, 2020: [Sentencing Memorandum]
  • January 15, 2020: [~Util - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • January 13, 2020: [Sentencing Memorandum and Motion for Downward Departure]
  • January 13, 2020: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
  • January 09, 2020: [Plea Agreement]
  • January 06, 2020: [Notice of Docket Entry Correction (PDF) - (ECF Admin Only)]
  • January 06, 2020: [Motions No Longer Referred]
  • January 06, 2020: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
  • January 06, 2020: [Motions Referred]
  • January 02, 2020: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • January 02, 2020: [Extension of Time]
December, 2019
  • December 09, 2019: [Show Cause]
  • December 04, 2019: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • December 02, 2019: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
November, 2019
  • November 18, 2019: [Suppress]
  • November 14, 2019: [Procedural / Scheduling Order]
  • November 14, 2019: [Notice of Hearing]
  • November 05, 2019: [Order on Motion for Release from Custody]
  • November 04, 2019: [Release from Custody]
  • November 04, 2019: [Miscellaneous Relief]
October, 2019
  • October 16, 2019: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Pretrial Motions]
  • October 15, 2019: [Extension of Time to File Pretrial Motions]
  • October 01, 2019: [Procedural / Scheduling Order]
  • October 01, 2019: [Notice of Hearing]
September, 2019
  • September 24, 2019: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • September 24, 2019: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • September 24, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 24, 2019: [~Util - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • September 17, 2019: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Pretrial Motions]
  • September 13, 2019: [Extension of Time]
  • September 12, 2019: [Notice of Hearing]
August, 2019
  • August 29, 2019: [Plea Agreement]
  • August 14, 2019: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Pretrial Motions]
  • August 12, 2019: [Extension of Time to File Pretrial Motions]
July, 2019
  • July 16, 2019: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Pretrial Motions]
  • July 15, 2019: [Extension of Time to File Pretrial Motions]
  • July 10, 2019: [Show Cause Hearing]
June, 2019
  • June 28, 2019: [Notice of Hearing]
  • June 27, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • June 26, 2019: [Continue]
  • June 25, 2019: [Notice of Hearing]
  • June 25, 2019: [Order on Motion for Order to Show Cause ]
  • June 24, 2019: [Show Cause]
  • June 21, 2019: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Pretrial Motions]
  • June 17, 2019: [Extension of Time to File Pretrial Motions]
  • June 13, 2019: [Notice of Docket Entry Correction (PDF) - (ECF Admin Only)]
  • June 12, 2019: [Search and Seizure Warrant Returned Executed]
May, 2019
  • May 28, 2019: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • May 28, 2019: [Motion Hearing]
  • May 21, 2019: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
  • May 21, 2019: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • May 20, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • May 20, 2019: [Motion Hearing]
  • May 20, 2019: [Reconsideration ]
  • May 20, 2019: [Document Unsealed]
April, 2019
  • April 30, 2019: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • April 30, 2019: [Motion Hearing]
  • April 25, 2019: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
  • April 24, 2019: [Motions Referred]
  • April 24, 2019: [Reconsideration ]
  • April 15, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • April 15, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 (NEF is sent - PDF is sealed)]
  • April 15, 2019: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • April 15, 2019: [~Util - Ruling on Motions]
  • April 15, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • April 15, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • April 12, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • April 12, 2019: [Pretrial Scheduling Order]
  • April 12, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 (NEF is sent - PDF is sealed)]
  • April 12, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • April 12, 2019: [Initial Appearance]
  • April 12, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • April 12, 2019: [~Util - Ruling on Motions]
  • April 12, 2019: [CJA 20 - Appointment]
  • April 11, 2019: [Detention]
  • April 11, 2019: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.