U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Vermont

vermont Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Vermont
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:19-cr-00064-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Prue
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2019
  • October 02, 2019: [Judgment]
  • October 02, 2019: [Bond Revocation Hearing]
  • October 02, 2019: [~Util - Ruling on Motions]
September, 2019
  • September 24, 2019: [Sentencing]
  • September 24, 2019: [Notice of Hearing]
  • September 10, 2019: [Sentencing Memorandum]
  • September 10, 2019: [Sentencing Memorandum and Motion for Downward Departure]
  • September 06, 2019: [Procedural / Scheduling Order]
August, 2019
  • August 23, 2019: [Notice of Hearing]
  • August 15, 2019: [Notice of Hearing]
  • August 15, 2019: [Procedural / Scheduling Order]
April, 2019
  • April 22, 2019: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • April 19, 2019: [Modify Conditions of Release]
  • April 16, 2019: [Order on Motion for Release from Custody]
  • April 15, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • April 15, 2019: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • April 15, 2019: [Release from Custody]
  • April 15, 2019: [Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge (Misdemeanor)]
  • April 15, 2019: [Information - ALL Misdemeanor]
  • April 15, 2019: [Plea Agreement]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.