U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Vermont

vermont Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Vermont
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:19-cr-00067-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Bunkley
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 30, 2022: [Notice of Docket Entry Correction (PDF)]
  • November 23, 2022: [Probation Form 12B]
March, 2021
  • March 22, 2021: [Transcript]
November, 2020
  • November 10, 2020: [Judgment]
  • November 10, 2020: [Sentencing]
  • November 09, 2020: [Supplemental Document(s)]
  • November 06, 2020: [Supplemental Document(s)]
  • November 04, 2020: [Supplemental Document(s)]
  • November 04, 2020: [Sentencing Memorandum]
  • November 02, 2020: [Notice of Hearing]
October, 2020
  • October 30, 2020: [Sentencing Memorandum]
  • October 15, 2020: [Notice of Appearance - Defendant]
  • October 15, 2020: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • October 15, 2020: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • October 14, 2020: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • October 12, 2020: [Appoint Counsel]
September, 2020
  • September 18, 2020: [Procedural / Scheduling Order]
  • September 18, 2020: [Notice of Hearing]
  • September 14, 2020: [Video Conference Waiver]
  • September 14, 2020: [Not a motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • September 14, 2020: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • September 03, 2020: [Notice of Docket Entry Removal - (ECF Admin Only)]
  • September 03, 2020: [Order of Detention]
  • September 03, 2020: [Motion Hearing]
  • September 03, 2020: [~Util - Ruling on Motions]
  • September 03, 2020: [~Util - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • September 03, 2020: [Not a motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
February, 2020
  • February 18, 2020: [Revocation of Release]
January, 2020
  • January 24, 2020: [Continue]
  • January 17, 2020: [Procedural / Scheduling Order]
  • January 17, 2020: [Notice of Hearing]
November, 2019
  • November 26, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • November 20, 2019: [Continue]
August, 2019
  • August 20, 2019: [Notice of Hearing]
  • August 20, 2019: [Procedural / Scheduling Order]
  • August 20, 2019: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • August 20, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 20, 2019: [Plea Agreement]
  • August 06, 2019: [Notice of Hearing]
July, 2019
  • July 23, 2019: [Search and Seizure Warrant Returned Executed]
  • July 23, 2019: [Seizure Warrant Returned Executed]
April, 2019
  • April 30, 2019: [Pretrial Scheduling Order]
  • April 30, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • April 30, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • April 18, 2019: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • April 18, 2019: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.