U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Vermont

vermont Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Vermont
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:19-cr-00049-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Gallagher et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 20, 2023: [Transmitted Index on Appeal]
  • January 16, 2023: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
  • January 13, 2023: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • January 13, 2023: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
December, 2022
  • December 06, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
September, 2022
  • September 14, 2022: [Continue]
August, 2022
  • August 01, 2022: [Notice of Docket Entry Correction (PDF)]
July, 2022
  • July 28, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • July 08, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
June, 2022
  • June 30, 2022: [Probation Form 12]
April, 2022
  • April 22, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • April 22, 2022: [Continue]
March, 2022
  • March 17, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 (NEF is sent - PDF is sealed)]
February, 2022
  • February 18, 2022: [Notice of Docket Entry Removal - (ECF Admin Only)]
  • February 18, 2022: [Letter]
  • February 10, 2022: [Motion Hearing]
  • February 09, 2022: [Waiver of Personal Appearance at Hearing (non-arraignment)]
  • February 07, 2022: [Withdraw as Attorney]
January, 2022
  • January 28, 2022: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
  • January 27, 2022: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • January 11, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • January 03, 2022: [Preliminary Revocation Hearing]
December, 2021
  • December 28, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
  • December 22, 2021: [Not a motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • December 22, 2021: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • December 21, 2021: [Notice of Appearance - Defendant]
  • December 16, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
  • December 14, 2021: [Probation Form 12]
August, 2021
  • August 24, 2021: [Order of Prosecutorial Obligation Under Fed. R. Crim. P. 5(f)]
  • August 24, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 (NEF is sent - PDF is sealed)]
  • August 24, 2021: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • August 19, 2021: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • August 05, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
  • August 03, 2021: [Probation Form 12]
April, 2021
  • April 19, 2021: [Receipt for Payment (criminal debt)]
March, 2021
  • March 24, 2021: [Judgment]
  • March 24, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Parties]
  • March 24, 2021: [Sentencing]
  • March 22, 2021: [Sentencing Memorandum and Motion for Downward Departure]
February, 2021
  • February 17, 2021: [Procedural / Scheduling Order]
  • February 17, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
September, 2020
  • September 09, 2020: [Judgment]
  • September 08, 2020: [Sentencing]
  • September 08, 2020: [~Util - Ruling on Motions]
  • September 03, 2020: [Sentencing Memorandum and Motion for Downward Departure]
February, 2020
  • February 03, 2020: [Procedural / Scheduling Order]
  • February 03, 2020: [Notice of Hearing]
January, 2020
  • January 14, 2020: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • January 14, 2020: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • January 14, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • January 14, 2020: [~Util - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • January 14, 2020: [Plea Agreement]
  • January 02, 2020: [Notice of Hearing]
November, 2019
  • November 27, 2019: [Reentry Drug Court Proceedings]
  • November 20, 2019: [Order]
  • November 20, 2019: [~Util - Ruling on Motions]
  • November 20, 2019: [~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • November 20, 2019: [Refer to Drug Court]
October, 2019
  • October 16, 2019: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Pretrial Motions]
  • October 01, 2019: [Extension of Time to File Pretrial Motions]
  • October 01, 2019: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • October 01, 2019: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • October 01, 2019: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • October 01, 2019: [~Util - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
September, 2019
  • September 27, 2019: [Notice of Hearing]
  • September 16, 2019: [Plea Agreement]
  • September 12, 2019: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • September 10, 2019: [Notice of Hearing]
August, 2019
  • August 29, 2019: [Withdraw as Attorney]
July, 2019
  • July 22, 2019: [Order on Motion to File Under Seal (NEF is sent - Order is not sealed)]
  • July 19, 2019: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Pretrial Motions]
  • July 17, 2019: [File Under Seal (NEF is sent - PDF is Sealed)(COURT USE ONLY)]
  • July 02, 2019: [Motion Hearing]
June, 2019
  • June 25, 2019: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
  • June 24, 2019: [Release from Custody]
  • June 14, 2019: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • June 14, 2019: [Pretrial Scheduling Order]
  • June 14, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 (NEF is sent - PDF is sealed)]
  • June 14, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • June 14, 2019: [Initial Appearance]
  • June 14, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • June 14, 2019: [CJA 20 - Appointment]
  • June 14, 2019: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • June 13, 2019: [Indictment Unsealed]
April, 2019
  • April 22, 2019: [Search and Seizure Warrant Returned Executed]
  • April 19, 2019: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • April 19, 2019: [Pretrial Scheduling Order]
  • April 19, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • April 19, 2019: [Initial Appearance]
  • April 19, 2019: [~Util - Ruling on Motions]
  • April 19, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • April 19, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • April 19, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 (NEF is sent - PDF is sealed)]
  • April 19, 2019: [CJA 20 - Appointment]
  • April 19, 2019: [Detention]
  • April 19, 2019: [Indictment - Redacted]
  • April 19, 2019: [Application for Search Warrant]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.