U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Vermont

vermont Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Vermont
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:19-cr-00068-1
  • Case Name: USA v. DeThomas
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
September, 2022
  • September 30, 2022: [Receipt for Payment (criminal debt)]
January, 2022
  • January 25, 2022: [Transfer Out/Probationer]
January, 2020
  • January 10, 2020: [Judgment]
  • January 09, 2020: [Sentencing]
  • January 09, 2020: [~Util - Ruling on Motions]
  • January 08, 2020: [Sentencing Memorandum and Motion for Downward Departure]
December, 2019
  • December 20, 2019: [Sentencing Memorandum]
September, 2019
  • September 12, 2019: [Procedural / Scheduling Order]
  • September 12, 2019: [Notice of Hearing]
  • September 10, 2019: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • September 10, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 10, 2019: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • September 10, 2019: [~Util - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • September 05, 2019: [Plea Agreement]
  • September 03, 2019: [Notice of Hearing]
July, 2019
  • July 25, 2019: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Pretrial Motions]
  • July 24, 2019: [Extension of Time to File Pretrial Motions]
  • July 24, 2019: [Search and Seizure Warrant Returned Executed]
  • July 01, 2019: [CJA 20 - Appointment]
  • July 01, 2019: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
June, 2019
  • June 26, 2019: [Withdraw as Attorney]
May, 2019
  • May 07, 2019: [Pretrial Scheduling Order]
  • May 07, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • May 07, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • May 01, 2019: [Notice of Hearing]
April, 2019
  • April 25, 2019: [Indictment]
  • April 24, 2019: [Notice of Appearance - Defendant]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.