U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Vermont

vermont Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Vermont
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:19-cr-00066-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Ruhl
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
March, 2025
  • March 17, 2025: [USCA Mandate]
January, 2023
  • January 23, 2023: [Order of Prosecutorial Obligation Under Fed. R. Crim. P. 5(f)]
  • January 23, 2023: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 (NEF is sent - PDF is sealed)]
  • January 23, 2023: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • January 13, 2023: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • January 04, 2023: [Notice of Hearing]
  • January 04, 2023: [Probation Form 12]
April, 2022
  • April 13, 2022: [Supplemental Index Sent USCA]
  • April 12, 2022: [Transcript - Appeal]
February, 2022
  • February 10, 2022: [Supplemental Index Sent USCA]
  • February 09, 2022: [Supplemental Index Sent USCA]
  • February 09, 2022: [Transcript - Appeal]
  • February 04, 2022: [Supplemental Index Sent USCA]
  • February 04, 2022: [Transcript - Appeal]
November, 2021
  • November 29, 2021: [Transmitted Index on Appeal]
  • November 19, 2021: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
  • November 05, 2021: [Judgment]
  • November 01, 2021: [Sentencing]
  • November 01, 2021: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
October, 2021
  • October 28, 2021: [Sentencing Memorandum]
  • October 28, 2021: [Sentencing Memorandum and Motion for Downward Departure]
  • October 26, 2021: [Procedural / Scheduling Order]
  • October 26, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
July, 2021
  • July 13, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
  • July 06, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
June, 2021
  • June 22, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
  • June 17, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
October, 2020
  • October 14, 2020: [Bond Revocation Hearing]
  • October 08, 2020: [Notice of Hearing]
September, 2019
  • September 13, 2019: [Reentry Drug Court Proceedings]
  • September 11, 2019: [CJA 20 - Appointment]
  • September 11, 2019: [Order on Motion to Refer Defendant to Drug Court]
  • September 11, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • September 11, 2019: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
  • September 09, 2019: [Notice of Docket Entry Correction (PDF) - (ECF Admin Only)]
  • September 09, 2019: [Refer to Drug Court]
  • September 09, 2019: [Continue]
  • September 09, 2019: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • September 09, 2019: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • September 09, 2019: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • September 09, 2019: [~Util - Terminate Deadlines]
  • September 09, 2019: [Plea Agreement]
  • September 09, 2019: [Information - Felony]
  • September 06, 2019: [Notice of Hearing]
August, 2019
  • August 12, 2019: [Order on Motion for Protective Order ]
  • August 09, 2019: [Protective Order]
July, 2019
  • July 29, 2019: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Pretrial Motions]
  • July 29, 2019: [Extension of Time to File Pretrial Motions]
  • July 11, 2019: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
June, 2019
  • June 27, 2019: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
  • June 19, 2019: [Order on Motion to Seal (NEF is sent - Order is not sealed)]
  • June 17, 2019: [Notice of Docket Entry Correction (ECF Admin Only)]
  • June 14, 2019: [Motions Referred]
  • June 14, 2019: [File Under Seal (NEF is sent - PDF is Sealed)(COURT USE ONLY)]
  • June 14, 2019: [File Under Seal (NEF is sent - Entry and PDF visible)]
  • June 14, 2019: [Reconsideration ]
May, 2019
  • May 06, 2019: [Notice of Appearance - Defendant]
April, 2019
  • April 29, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • April 29, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • April 29, 2019: [~Util - Ruling on Motions]
  • April 29, 2019: [Order Scheduling a Detention Hearing]
  • April 29, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 (NEF is sent - PDF is sealed)]
  • April 26, 2019: [Pretrial Scheduling Order]
  • April 26, 2019: [Notice of Docket Entry Correction (PDF) - (ECF Admin Only)]
  • April 26, 2019: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
  • April 26, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • April 26, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • April 26, 2019: [Motion Hearing]
  • April 26, 2019: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • April 26, 2019: [Detention]
  • April 26, 2019: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.