U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Vermont

vermont Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Vermont
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:19-cr-00056-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Fossi
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2021
  • January 26, 2021: [Receipt for Payment (criminal debt)]
November, 2020
  • November 30, 2020: [Judgment]
  • November 30, 2020: [Plea and Sentence]
  • November 25, 2020: [Sentencing Memorandum]
  • November 24, 2020: [Video Conference Waiver]
  • November 24, 2020: [Notice of Hearing]
October, 2020
  • October 08, 2020: [Information - ALL Misdemeanor]
  • October 08, 2020: [Plea Agreement]
September, 2019
  • September 13, 2019: [Reentry Drug Court Proceedings]
  • September 11, 2019: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
  • September 10, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • September 10, 2019: [Order on Motion to Refer Defendant to Drug Court]
  • September 10, 2019: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • September 10, 2019: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • September 10, 2019: [~Util - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • September 10, 2019: [Continue]
  • September 10, 2019: [Refer to Drug Court]
  • September 03, 2019: [Notice of Hearing]
  • September 03, 2019: [Plea Agreement]
July, 2019
  • July 29, 2019: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Pretrial Motions]
  • July 29, 2019: [Extension of Time to File Pretrial Motions]
May, 2019
  • May 02, 2019: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • May 02, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • May 02, 2019: [~Util - Ruling on Motions]
April, 2019
  • April 30, 2019: [Order Scheduling a Detention Hearing]
  • April 30, 2019: [Pretrial Scheduling Order]
  • April 30, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 (NEF is sent - PDF is sealed)]
  • April 30, 2019: [Initial Appearance]
  • April 30, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • April 30, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • April 30, 2019: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • April 30, 2019: [CJA 20 - Appointment]
  • April 30, 2019: [Detention]
  • April 30, 2019: [Indictment Unsealed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.