U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Vermont

vermont Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Vermont
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:19-cr-00044-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Ashford
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 23, 2025: [Transfer Out/Probationer]
December, 2022
  • December 27, 2022: [Transcript]
March, 2022
  • March 29, 2022: [Judgment]
  • March 29, 2022: [Sentencing]
  • March 29, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • March 24, 2022: [Supplemental Sentencing Memorandum]
  • March 21, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum]
November, 2021
  • November 22, 2021: [Notice of Docket Entry Correction (PDF) - (ECF Admin Only)]
  • November 19, 2021: [Procedural / Scheduling Order]
  • November 19, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
  • November 19, 2021: [Order Reassigning Case]
  • November 11, 2021: [Procedural / Scheduling Order]
  • November 11, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
October, 2021
  • October 05, 2021: [Video Conference Waiver]
September, 2021
  • September 30, 2021: [Not a motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • September 30, 2021: [Reconsideration, Review, or to Vacate Order of Detention]
  • September 27, 2021: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
  • September 20, 2021: [Certificate]
  • September 20, 2021: [Order]
  • September 16, 2021: [Reconsideration, Review, or to Vacate Order of Detention]
November, 2020
  • November 25, 2020: [Notice of Docket Entry Correction (PDF) - (ECF Admin Only)]
  • November 10, 2020: [Order of Detention]
  • November 10, 2020: [Video Conference Waiver]
  • November 10, 2020: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • November 09, 2020: [Document Unsealed]
October, 2020
  • October 22, 2020: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • October 22, 2020: [Continue]
August, 2020
  • August 12, 2020: [Procedural / Scheduling Order]
  • August 12, 2020: [Notice of Hearing]
  • August 07, 2020: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • August 07, 2020: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • August 05, 2020: [Continue]
  • August 05, 2020: [Release from Custody]
July, 2020
  • July 30, 2020: [Notice of Hearing]
June, 2020
  • June 11, 2020: [Notice of Hearing]
  • June 11, 2020: [~Util - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • June 11, 2020: [Status Conference]
  • June 11, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • June 10, 2020: [Waiver of Personal Appearance at Hearing (non-arraignment)]
  • June 04, 2020: [Notice of Hearing]
  • June 01, 2020: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Pretrial Motions]
May, 2020
  • May 29, 2020: [Extension of Time]
April, 2020
  • April 13, 2020: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Pretrial Motions]
March, 2020
  • March 26, 2020: [Extension of Time to File Pretrial Motions]
February, 2020
  • February 27, 2020: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Pretrial Motions]
  • February 26, 2020: [Extension of Time to File Pretrial Motions]
January, 2020
  • January 30, 2020: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Pretrial Motions]
  • January 29, 2020: [Extension of Time]
  • January 02, 2020: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Pretrial Motions]
December, 2019
  • December 30, 2019: [Extension of Time]
November, 2019
  • November 18, 2019: [Order on Motion to Extend Time]
  • November 18, 2019: [Extension of Time]
  • November 15, 2019: [Order on Motion to Compel ]
  • November 15, 2019: [Order on Motion to Suppress]
  • November 13, 2019: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • November 07, 2019: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • November 07, 2019: [Motion Hearing]
  • November 07, 2019: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • November 01, 2019: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
October, 2019
  • October 28, 2019: [Motions Referred]
  • October 28, 2019: [Release from Custody]
  • October 28, 2019: [Compel]
  • October 28, 2019: [Suppress]
September, 2019
  • September 27, 2019: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Pretrial Motions]
  • September 26, 2019: [Extension of Time to File Pretrial Motions]
August, 2019
  • August 28, 2019: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Pretrial Motions]
  • August 27, 2019: [Extension of Time to File Pretrial Motions]
  • August 27, 2019: [Extension of Time]
July, 2019
  • July 25, 2019: [Warrant Returned Executed]
May, 2019
  • May 31, 2019: [Indictment Unsealed]
  • May 30, 2019: [Pretrial Scheduling Order]
  • May 30, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • May 30, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 (NEF is sent - PDF is sealed)]
  • May 30, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • May 30, 2019: [Initial Appearance]
  • May 30, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • May 30, 2019: [~Util - Ruling on Motions]
  • May 30, 2019: [Detention]
  • May 15, 2019: [Notice of Hearing]
  • May 14, 2019: [CJA 20 - Appointment]
  • May 03, 2019: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.