U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Vermont

vermont Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Vermont
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:19-cr-00070-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Duprey
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
February, 2020
  • February 11, 2020: [Order Releasing Collateral]
December, 2019
  • December 20, 2019: [Judgment]
  • December 20, 2019: [~Util - Ruling on Motions]
  • December 20, 2019: [Sentencing]
  • December 13, 2019: [Sentencing Memorandum]
  • December 09, 2019: [Sentencing Memorandum]
  • December 05, 2019: [Bond Revocation Hearing]
  • December 02, 2019: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
November, 2019
  • November 06, 2019: [Notice of Hearing]
September, 2019
  • September 04, 2019: [Procedural / Scheduling Order]
  • September 04, 2019: [Notice of Hearing]
August, 2019
  • August 28, 2019: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • August 28, 2019: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • August 28, 2019: [~Util - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • August 28, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 27, 2019: [Plea Agreement]
July, 2019
  • July 18, 2019: [Notice of Hearing]
June, 2019
  • June 13, 2019: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • June 13, 2019: [Notice of Appearance - Defendant]
May, 2019
  • May 17, 2019: [Pretrial Scheduling Order]
  • May 17, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • May 17, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • May 17, 2019: [Waiver of Personal Appearance at Arraignment]
  • May 14, 2019: [Notice of Hearing]
  • May 10, 2019: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.