U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Vermont

vermont Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Vermont
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:19-cr-00071-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Chipp
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
June, 2021
  • June 08, 2021: [Amended Judgment]
  • June 05, 2021: [Order on Motion for Compassionate Release]
  • June 05, 2021: [Order on Motion to Reduce Sentence]
May, 2021
  • May 06, 2021: [Response to Motion]
April, 2021
  • April 22, 2021: [Compassionate Release]
December, 2020
  • December 28, 2020: [Transcript]
July, 2020
  • July 27, 2020: [Notice of Docket Entry Correction (PDF) - (ECF Admin Only)]
  • July 23, 2020: [Judgment]
  • July 23, 2020: [~Util - Terminate Parties]
  • July 23, 2020: [Sentencing]
  • July 21, 2020: [Sentencing Memorandum and Motion for Downward Departure]
  • July 17, 2020: [Sentencing Memorandum]
June, 2020
  • June 23, 2020: [Procedural / Scheduling Order]
  • June 23, 2020: [Notice of Hearing]
April, 2020
  • April 15, 2020: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • April 15, 2020: [Continue]
January, 2020
  • January 14, 2020: [Procedural / Scheduling Order]
  • January 14, 2020: [Notice of Hearing]
  • January 08, 2020: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • January 08, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • January 08, 2020: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • January 08, 2020: [~Util - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
December, 2019
  • December 16, 2019: [Notice of Hearing]
  • December 16, 2019: [Plea Agreement]
  • December 16, 2019: [Information - Felony]
November, 2019
  • November 18, 2019: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Pretrial Motions]
  • November 15, 2019: [Extension of Time to File Pretrial Motions]
September, 2019
  • September 13, 2019: [Pretrial Scheduling Order]
August, 2019
  • August 28, 2019: [Notice of Hearing]
  • August 14, 2019: [Indictment]
  • August 09, 2019: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Pretrial Motions]
  • August 08, 2019: [Extension of Time to File Pretrial Motions]
May, 2019
  • May 17, 2019: [Notice of Appearance - Defendant]
  • May 13, 2019: [Pretrial Scheduling Order]
  • May 13, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • May 13, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • May 13, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • May 13, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • May 13, 2019: [~Util - Ruling on Motions]
  • May 10, 2019: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.