U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Vermont

vermont Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Vermont
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:12-cr-00111-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Jayne
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
July, 2020
  • July 06, 2020: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • July 06, 2020: [Video Conference Waiver]
June, 2020
  • June 24, 2020: [Notice of Hearing]
December, 2019
  • December 03, 2019: [Notice of Hearing]
November, 2019
  • November 21, 2019: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • November 20, 2019: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • November 18, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 (NEF is sent - PDF is sealed)]
  • November 15, 2019: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • November 01, 2019: [Attorney Substitution]
  • November 01, 2019: [Notice of Hearing]
October, 2019
  • October 31, 2019: [Probation Form 12]
May, 2019
  • May 10, 2019: [Probation Form 12B]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.