U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Vermont

vermont Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Vermont
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:19-cr-00069-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Alston
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2021
  • May 11, 2021: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
April, 2021
  • April 12, 2021: [Appoint Counsel]
March, 2021
  • March 22, 2021: [Order on Motion for Compassionate Release]
November, 2020
  • November 06, 2020: [Order on Motion to Seal (NEF is sent - Order is not sealed)]
  • November 05, 2020: [File Under Seal (NEF is sent - Entry and PDF visible)]
  • November 05, 2020: [Notice of Docket Entry Correction (ECF Admin Only)]
October, 2020
  • October 19, 2020: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • October 05, 2020: [Compassionate Release]
July, 2020
  • July 08, 2020: [Notice of Docket Entry Correction (PDF) - (ECF Admin Only)]
  • July 08, 2020: [USCA Mandate]
March, 2020
  • March 30, 2020: [Supplemental Index Sent USCA]
  • March 30, 2020: [Transcript - Appeal]
  • March 26, 2020: [Supplemental Index Sent USCA]
  • March 21, 2020: [Transcript - Appeal]
February, 2020
  • February 14, 2020: [Transmitted Index on Appeal]
  • February 10, 2020: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
January, 2020
  • January 27, 2020: [Judgment]
  • January 27, 2020: [~Util - Terminate Parties]
  • January 27, 2020: [Sentencing]
  • January 23, 2020: [Sentencing Memorandum and Motion for Downward Departure]
  • January 21, 2020: [Procedural / Scheduling Order]
  • January 21, 2020: [Notice of Hearing]
  • January 03, 2020: [Sentencing Memorandum]
December, 2019
  • December 23, 2019: [Procedural / Scheduling Order]
  • December 23, 2019: [Notice of Hearing]
August, 2019
  • August 30, 2019: [Notice of Hearing]
  • August 30, 2019: [Procedural / Scheduling Order]
  • August 30, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 30, 2019: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • August 30, 2019: [~Util - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • August 30, 2019: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • August 30, 2019: [Plea Agreement]
  • August 27, 2019: [Notice of Hearing]
July, 2019
  • July 31, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • July 22, 2019: [Notice of Hearing]
  • July 11, 2019: [Indictment]
May, 2019
  • May 17, 2019: [Notice of Appearance - Defendant]
  • May 16, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • May 16, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • May 16, 2019: [~Util - Ruling on Motions]
  • May 16, 2019: [Supplemental Document(s)]
  • May 14, 2019: [Order Scheduling a Detention Hearing]
  • May 14, 2019: [Pretrial Scheduling Order]
  • May 14, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 (NEF is sent - PDF is sealed)]
  • May 14, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • May 14, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • May 14, 2019: [Initial Appearance]
  • May 14, 2019: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • May 13, 2019: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • May 13, 2019: [Detention]
  • May 13, 2019: [Indictment Unsealed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.