U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Vermont

vermont Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Vermont
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:19-cr-00075-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Hulett
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
February, 2020
  • February 18, 2020: [Notice (Other)]
January, 2020
  • January 16, 2020: [Judgment]
  • January 16, 2020: [~Util - Terminate Parties]
  • January 16, 2020: [Sentencing]
  • January 15, 2020: [Order on Motion to Seal (NEF is sent - Order is not sealed)]
  • January 12, 2020: [Sentencing Memorandum]
  • January 07, 2020: [File Under Seal (NEF is sent - Entry and PDF visible)]
  • January 07, 2020: [Notice (Other)]
  • January 06, 2020: [Sentencing Memorandum]
September, 2019
  • September 30, 2019: [Procedural / Scheduling Order]
  • September 30, 2019: [Notice of Hearing]
  • September 18, 2019: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • September 18, 2019: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • September 18, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 18, 2019: [~Util - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • September 18, 2019: [Receipt for Payment (criminal debt)]
August, 2019
  • August 29, 2019: [Notice of Hearing]
  • August 27, 2019: [Plea Agreement]
May, 2019
  • May 30, 2019: [Search and Seizure Warrant Returned Executed]
  • May 24, 2019: [Pretrial Scheduling Order]
  • May 24, 2019: [Waiver of Personal Appearance at Arraignment]
  • May 24, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • May 24, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • May 17, 2019: [Notice of Appearance - Defendant]
  • May 16, 2019: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.