U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Vermont

vermont Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Vermont
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:19-cr-00073-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Hamlin
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
July, 2021
  • July 13, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Parties]
  • July 13, 2021: [Judgment]
  • July 12, 2021: [Sentencing]
  • July 08, 2021: [Sentencing Memorandum and Motion for Downward Departure]
June, 2021
  • June 17, 2021: [Video Conference Waiver]
  • June 09, 2021: [Procedural / Scheduling Order]
  • June 09, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
March, 2021
  • March 30, 2021: [Continue]
February, 2021
  • February 25, 2021: [Procedural / Scheduling Order]
  • February 25, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
November, 2020
  • November 23, 2020: [Continue]
  • November 23, 2020: [Sentencing Memorandum]
  • November 23, 2020: [Order on Motion to Seal (NEF is sent - Order is not sealed)]
  • November 20, 2020: [File Under Seal (NEF is sent - Entry and PDF visible)]
  • November 20, 2020: [Notice of Filing Victim Impact Statements]
September, 2020
  • September 09, 2020: [Procedural / Scheduling Order]
  • September 09, 2020: [Notice of Hearing]
August, 2020
  • August 10, 2020: [Continue]
June, 2020
  • June 23, 2020: [Procedural / Scheduling Order]
  • June 23, 2020: [Notice of Hearing]
May, 2020
  • May 15, 2020: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • May 14, 2020: [Continue]
  • May 05, 2020: [Order on Motion for Release from Custody]
  • May 05, 2020: [Notice of Docket Entry Correction (PDF) - (ECF Admin Only)]
  • May 04, 2020: [Reply to Response to Motion]
April, 2020
  • April 29, 2020: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • April 23, 2020: [Release from Custody]
January, 2020
  • January 29, 2020: [Procedural / Scheduling Order]
  • January 29, 2020: [Notice of Hearing]
  • January 28, 2020: [Procedural / Scheduling Order]
  • January 28, 2020: [Notice of Hearing]
  • January 28, 2020: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • January 28, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • January 28, 2020: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • January 28, 2020: [~Util - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • January 24, 2020: [Notice of Hearing]
  • January 24, 2020: [Plea Agreement]
  • January 24, 2020: [Information - Felony]
  • January 15, 2020: [Notice of Hearing]
December, 2019
  • December 27, 2019: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Pretrial Motions]
  • December 26, 2019: [Extension of Time to File Pretrial Motions]
November, 2019
  • November 14, 2019: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Pretrial Motions]
  • November 13, 2019: [Extension of Time to File Pretrial Motions]
October, 2019
  • October 16, 2019: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Pretrial Motions]
  • October 11, 2019: [Extension of Time to File Pretrial Motions]
September, 2019
  • September 17, 2019: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Pretrial Motions]
  • September 16, 2019: [Extension of Time to File Pretrial Motions]
August, 2019
  • August 19, 2019: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Pretrial Motions]
  • August 15, 2019: [Extension of Time to File Pretrial Motions]
July, 2019
  • July 26, 2019: [Search and Seizure Warrant Returned Executed]
June, 2019
  • June 17, 2019: [Document Unsealed]
  • June 17, 2019: [Order on Motion to Unseal Document ]
May, 2019
  • May 31, 2019: [Unseal Document (Court use only)]
  • May 17, 2019: [Notice of Appearance - Defendant]
  • May 17, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • May 17, 2019: [Pretrial Scheduling Order]
  • May 17, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • May 17, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • May 17, 2019: [~Util - Ruling on Motions]
  • May 17, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • May 17, 2019: [Notice (Other)]
  • May 16, 2019: [Application for Search Warrant]
  • May 16, 2019: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.