U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Vermont

vermont Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Vermont
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:19-cr-00074-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Biathrow
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2020
  • April 23, 2020: [Notice of Appearance - Defendant]
October, 2019
  • October 21, 2019: [Pretrial Conference ]
  • October 21, 2019: [~Util - Terminate Hearings]
  • October 21, 2019: [Plea Agreement]
  • October 07, 2019: [Notice of Hearing]
September, 2019
  • September 26, 2019: [Notice of Docket Entry Correction (PDF) - (ECF Admin Only)]
  • September 26, 2019: [Notice of Hearing]
July, 2019
  • July 29, 2019: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Pretrial Motions]
  • July 23, 2019: [Extension of Time to File Pretrial Motions]
June, 2019
  • June 07, 2019: [Notice of Appearance - Defendant]
May, 2019
  • May 30, 2019: [Seizure Warrant Returned Executed]
  • May 24, 2019: [Pretrial Scheduling Order]
  • May 24, 2019: [Waiver of Personal Appearance at Arraignment]
  • May 24, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • May 24, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • May 16, 2019: [Indictment]
  • May 16, 2019: [Notice of Hearing]
  • May 16, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • May 16, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • May 16, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 16, 2019: [~Util - Ruling on Motions]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.