U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Vermont

vermont Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Vermont
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:19-cr-00079-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Calhoun
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 07, 2022: [Transcript]
November, 2022
  • November 08, 2022: [Judgment on Revocation]
July, 2022
  • July 26, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • July 07, 2022: [Preliminary Revocation Hearing]
June, 2022
  • June 28, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • June 24, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • June 24, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed]
March, 2022
  • March 22, 2022: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • March 15, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • March 14, 2022: [Probation Form 12]
February, 2022
  • February 18, 2022: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • February 17, 2022: [Notice of Appearance - Defendant]
July, 2021
  • July 20, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • July 19, 2021: [Video Conference Waiver]
  • July 19, 2021: [Motion Hearing]
  • July 16, 2021: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
  • July 09, 2021: [Motions Referred]
  • July 08, 2021: [Release from Custody]
  • July 08, 2021: [Reconsideration, Review, or to Vacate Order of Detention]
June, 2021
  • June 17, 2021: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • June 16, 2021: [Order of Prosecutorial Obligation Under Fed. R. Crim. P. 5(f)]
  • June 16, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 (NEF is sent - PDF is sealed)]
  • June 16, 2021: [Video Conference Waiver]
  • June 16, 2021: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • June 14, 2021: [Rule 5(c)(3) Documents Received]
  • June 09, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
  • June 09, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
May, 2021
  • May 28, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • May 27, 2021: [Document Unsealed]
May, 2020
  • May 07, 2020: [Transcript]
January, 2020
  • January 24, 2020: [Judgment]
  • January 24, 2020: [Sentencing]
  • January 22, 2020: [Supplemental Document(s)]
  • January 20, 2020: [Sentencing Memorandum and Motion for Downward Departure]
  • January 14, 2020: [Sentencing Memorandum]
October, 2019
  • October 28, 2019: [Notice of Hearing]
  • October 22, 2019: [Procedural / Scheduling Order]
  • October 22, 2019: [Notice of Hearing]
  • October 18, 2019: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • October 18, 2019: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • October 18, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 18, 2019: [~Util - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • October 18, 2019: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • October 16, 2019: [Plea Agreement]
  • October 16, 2019: [Information - Felony]
  • October 08, 2019: [Notice of Hearing]
September, 2019
  • September 12, 2019: [Notice of Hearing]
June, 2019
  • June 13, 2019: [Notice of Appearance - Defendant]
  • June 05, 2019: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • June 04, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • June 04, 2019: [Pretrial Scheduling Order]
  • June 04, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 (NEF is sent - PDF is sealed)]
  • June 04, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • June 04, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • June 04, 2019: [Initial Appearance]
  • June 04, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • June 04, 2019: [~Util - Ruling on Motions]
  • June 04, 2019: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • June 04, 2019: [Detention]
May, 2019
  • May 24, 2019: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.