U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Vermont

vermont Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Vermont
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:19-cr-00078-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Fiore
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2024
  • December 22, 2024: [Continue]
January, 2023
  • January 17, 2023: [Dismiss]
October, 2022
  • October 20, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Pretrial Motions]
  • October 18, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Pretrial Motions]
  • October 13, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Pretrial Motions]
  • October 12, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Pretrial Motions]
September, 2022
  • September 19, 2022: [Order Releasing Collateral]
July, 2022
  • July 21, 2022: [Transcript]
  • July 12, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Pretrial Motions]
  • July 11, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Pretrial Motions]
April, 2022
  • April 15, 2022: [Notice of Appearance - Defendant]
  • April 15, 2022: [Receipt for Passport]
  • April 14, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • April 12, 2022: [Order of Prosecutorial Obligation Under Fed. R. Crim. P. 5(f)]
  • April 12, 2022: [Order of Detention]
  • April 12, 2022: [Pretrial Scheduling Order]
  • April 12, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 (NEF is sent - PDF is sealed)]
  • April 12, 2022: [Arraignment]
  • April 12, 2022: [~Util - Ruling on Motions]
  • April 12, 2022: [Initial Appearance]
  • April 12, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • April 08, 2022: [Order on Motion to Seal (NEF is sent - Order is not sealed)]
  • April 08, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • April 08, 2022: [Detention]
  • April 08, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • April 07, 2022: [File Under Seal (NEF is sent - Entry and PDF visible)]
  • April 04, 2022: [Exhibit List]
  • April 04, 2022: [File Under Seal (NEF is sent - Entry and PDF visible)]
March, 2022
  • March 31, 2022: [Judgment]
  • March 28, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • March 28, 2022: [Sentencing]
  • March 28, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 28, 2022: [Notice of Docket Entry Correction (PDF) - (ECF Admin Only)]
  • March 28, 2022: [Transcript]
  • March 25, 2022: [Receipt for Payment (criminal debt)]
  • March 24, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • March 23, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • March 22, 2022: [Order on Sealed Motion (Sealed - No NEF)]
  • March 22, 2022: [Reply]
  • March 21, 2022: [Not a motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • March 21, 2022: [Notice of Filing Victim Impact Statements]
  • March 21, 2022: [Sealed Motion (Sealed - No NEF)(COURT USE ONLY)]
  • March 21, 2022: [Errata]
  • March 21, 2022: [Notice of Docket Entry Correction (PDF) - (ECF Admin Only)]
  • March 18, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum]
  • March 16, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum and Motion for Downward Departure]
  • March 10, 2022: [Procedural / Scheduling Order]
  • March 10, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • March 03, 2022: [Procedural / Scheduling Order]
  • March 03, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
February, 2022
  • February 24, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • February 22, 2022: [Continue]
  • February 18, 2022: [Order on Motion to Seal (NEF is sent - Order is not sealed)]
  • February 15, 2022: [Order on Motion to Seal (NEF is sent - Order is not sealed)]
  • February 15, 2022: [File Under Seal (NEF is sent - Entry and PDF visible)]
  • February 15, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • February 08, 2022: [Order on Motion to File Under Seal (NEF is sent - Order is not sealed)]
  • February 08, 2022: [Order on Motion to Seal (NEF is sent - Order is not sealed)]
  • February 08, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • February 08, 2022: [Notice of Docket Entry Correction (ECF Admin Only)]
  • February 08, 2022: [File Under Seal (NEF is sent - Entry and PDF visible)]
  • February 08, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • February 03, 2022: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • February 02, 2022: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • February 02, 2022: [File Under Seal (NEF is sent - PDF is Sealed)(COURT USE ONLY)]
  • February 02, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • February 01, 2022: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
January, 2022
  • January 27, 2022: [Continue]
October, 2021
  • October 15, 2021: [Procedural / Scheduling Order]
  • October 15, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
  • October 14, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • October 14, 2021: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • October 14, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • October 14, 2021: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • October 14, 2021: [~Util - Ruling on Motions]
  • October 14, 2021: [Plea Agreement]
  • October 12, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
  • October 12, 2021: [Plea Agreement]
  • October 05, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
August, 2021
  • August 13, 2021: [Sur-Reply to Motion]
  • August 06, 2021: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
July, 2021
  • July 23, 2021: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • July 09, 2021: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • July 08, 2021: [Affidavit]
  • July 08, 2021: [Transcript]
  • July 08, 2021: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • July 08, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
June, 2021
  • June 30, 2021: [Suppress]
April, 2021
  • April 28, 2021: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
  • April 15, 2021: [Search and Seizure Warrant Returned Executed]
March, 2021
  • March 19, 2021: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 19, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 18, 2021: [Application for Search Warrant]
January, 2021
  • January 19, 2021: [Order on Motion to Suppress]
December, 2020
  • December 23, 2020: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • December 22, 2020: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Pretrial Motions]
  • December 21, 2020: [Extension of Time to File Pretrial Motions]
  • December 09, 2020: [Order on Motion to Suppress]
  • December 08, 2020: [Response]
  • December 04, 2020: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • December 04, 2020: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • December 03, 2020: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
November, 2020
  • November 19, 2020: [Memorandum in Support]
  • November 06, 2020: [CJA 20 - Appointment]
October, 2020
  • October 26, 2020: [Document Unsealed]
  • October 23, 2020: [Order on Motion to Unseal Document ]
  • October 22, 2020: [Unseal Document (Court use only)]
  • October 20, 2020: [Telephone Conference]
  • October 16, 2020: [Notice of Hearing]
September, 2020
  • September 22, 2020: [Pretrial Scheduling Order]
  • September 22, 2020: [Waiver of Personal Appearance at Arraignment]
  • September 22, 2020: [Arraignment]
  • September 22, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • September 22, 2020: [Indictment Unsealed]
  • September 22, 2020: [Order on Motion to Unseal Document ]
  • September 22, 2020: [Unseal Document (Court use only)]
  • September 18, 2020: [Notice of Hearing]
  • September 15, 2020: [Indictment - Redacted]
August, 2020
  • August 21, 2020: [Pretrial Scheduling Order]
  • August 21, 2020: [Teleconference Waiver]
  • August 18, 2020: [Notice of Hearing]
  • August 17, 2020: [Order]
  • August 17, 2020: [~Util - Ruling on Motions]
  • August 17, 2020: [~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • August 17, 2020: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • August 13, 2020: [Indictment]
July, 2020
  • July 22, 2020: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
  • July 20, 2020: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
  • July 15, 2020: [Notice of Docket Entry Correction (PDF) - (ECF Admin Only)]
  • July 14, 2020: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
May, 2020
  • May 21, 2020: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • May 21, 2020: [Document Unsealed]
  • May 21, 2020: [Order of Detention]
  • May 21, 2020: [Teleconference Waiver]
  • May 06, 2020: [Revocation of Release]
April, 2020
  • April 29, 2020: [Attorney Substitution]
  • April 28, 2020: [Order on Motion for Hearing]
  • April 28, 2020: [Hearing]
January, 2020
  • January 16, 2020: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • January 03, 2020: [CJA 20 - Appointment]
December, 2019
  • December 30, 2019: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • December 27, 2019: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • December 18, 2019: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
  • December 17, 2019: [Notice of Docket Entry Correction (PDF) - (ECF Admin Only)]
  • December 16, 2019: [Suppress]
  • December 04, 2019: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Pretrial Motions]
  • December 02, 2019: [Extension of Time to File Pretrial Motions]
September, 2019
  • September 12, 2019: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • September 12, 2019: [Bond Hearing]
  • September 12, 2019: [Motion Hearing]
  • September 12, 2019: [~Util - Ruling on Motions]
  • September 10, 2019: [Motions Referred]
  • September 10, 2019: [Modify Conditions of Release]
  • September 04, 2019: [Notice of Hearing]
  • September 04, 2019: [Waiver of Personal Appearance at Arraignment]
  • September 04, 2019: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Pretrial Motions]
  • September 03, 2019: [Extension of Time to File Pretrial Motions]
  • September 03, 2019: [Extension of Time]
August, 2019
  • August 23, 2019: [Notice of Hearing]
  • August 22, 2019: [Indictment]
June, 2019
  • June 06, 2019: [Search and Seizure Warrant Returned Executed]
  • June 04, 2019: [Pretrial Scheduling Order]
  • June 04, 2019: [Waiver of Personal Appearance at Arraignment]
  • June 04, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • June 04, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
May, 2019
  • May 24, 2019: [Indictment]
  • May 24, 2019: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.