U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Vermont

vermont Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Vermont
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:19-cr-00080-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Woodson
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 22, 2022: [Order on Motion for Hearing]
  • December 22, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • December 21, 2022: [Response to Motion]
  • December 13, 2022: [Hearing]
  • December 02, 2022: [Continue]
October, 2022
  • October 26, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • October 20, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • October 19, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
September, 2022
  • September 15, 2022: [Procedural / Scheduling Order]
  • September 15, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
August, 2022
  • August 30, 2022: [Plea Agreement]
  • August 29, 2022: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • August 29, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • August 17, 2022: [Information - Felony]
  • August 15, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • August 12, 2022: [Plea Agreement]
  • August 11, 2022: [Transcript]
July, 2022
  • July 29, 2022: [Transcript]
  • July 06, 2022: [Judgment]
  • July 05, 2022: [Sentencing]
June, 2022
  • June 30, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum]
  • June 30, 2022: [Continue]
  • June 17, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum]
  • June 07, 2022: [Transcript]
  • June 03, 2022: [Procedural / Scheduling Order]
  • June 02, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
May, 2022
  • May 26, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • May 26, 2022: [Judgment]
  • May 26, 2022: [Sentencing]
  • May 25, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • May 24, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • May 24, 2022: [Supplemental Document(s)]
  • May 20, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum]
  • May 18, 2022: [Notice of Docket Entry Correction (PDF) - (ECF Admin Only)]
  • May 17, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum and Motion for Downward Departure]
  • May 03, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • May 02, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • May 02, 2022: [Continue]
April, 2022
  • April 21, 2022: [Response to Motion]
  • April 12, 2022: [Procedural / Scheduling Order]
  • April 12, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • April 07, 2022: [Continue]
March, 2022
  • March 28, 2022: [Motion Hearing]
  • March 24, 2022: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration of Detention]
  • March 24, 2022: [Notice of Docket Entry Correction (PDF) - (ECF Admin Only)]
  • March 24, 2022: [Reconsideration, Review, or to Vacate Order of Detention]
  • March 24, 2022: [Hearing]
  • March 24, 2022: [Video Conference Waiver]
  • March 22, 2022: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
  • March 14, 2022: [Judgment]
  • March 14, 2022: [Sentencing]
  • March 10, 2022: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • March 08, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum]
  • March 07, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum and Motion for Downward Departure]
  • March 04, 2022: [Procedural / Scheduling Order]
  • March 04, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • March 03, 2022: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • March 03, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • March 03, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 01, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
February, 2022
  • February 28, 2022: [Status Conference]
  • February 28, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • February 23, 2022: [Video Conference Waiver]
  • February 15, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • February 11, 2022: [Continue]
  • February 10, 2022: [Transcript]
  • February 08, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • February 08, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • February 01, 2022: [Continue]
January, 2022
  • January 31, 2022: [Information - Felony]
  • January 31, 2022: [Notice of Docket Entry Correction (PDF) - (ECF Admin Only)]
  • January 26, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • January 21, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • January 21, 2022: [Continue]
  • January 21, 2022: [Plea Agreement]
  • January 20, 2022: [Telephone Conference]
  • January 19, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • January 10, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • January 06, 2022: [Memorandum in Support]
  • January 03, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
December, 2021
  • December 27, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
  • December 27, 2021: [Waiver of Personal Appearance at Arraignment]
  • December 21, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
  • December 17, 2021: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
  • December 16, 2021: [Reconsideration, Review, or to Vacate Order of Detention]
  • December 16, 2021: [Indictment]
  • December 07, 2021: [Notice of Docket Entry Removal - (ECF Admin Only)]
November, 2021
  • November 18, 2021: [Procedural / Scheduling Order]
  • November 18, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
  • November 18, 2021: [Video Conference Waiver]
  • November 15, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
  • November 09, 2021: [Procedural / Scheduling Order]
  • November 09, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
  • November 09, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 09, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • November 09, 2021: [Order on Motion to Substitute Attorney]
  • November 08, 2021: [Notice of Docket Entry Correction (ECF Admin Only)]
  • November 08, 2021: [Notice of Docket Entry Removal - (ECF Admin Only)]
  • November 08, 2021: [Plea Agreement]
  • November 08, 2021: [Substitute Attorney]
  • November 01, 2021: [Video Conference Waiver]
  • November 01, 2021: [Order on Motion to Exclude]
  • November 01, 2021: [Exclude]
October, 2021
  • October 28, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
  • October 28, 2021: [Order on Motion to Withdraw Plea of Guilty]
  • October 28, 2021: [Order on Motion to Strike ]
  • October 27, 2021: [Notice of Docket Entry Correction (PDF) - (ECF Admin Only)]
  • October 27, 2021: [Withdraw Plea of Guilty]
  • October 27, 2021: [Strike]
  • October 27, 2021: [Video Conference Waiver]
  • October 26, 2021: [Video Conference Waiver]
  • October 26, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
  • October 26, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • October 26, 2021: [Pretrial Conference ]
  • October 26, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • October 15, 2021: [Video Conference Waiver]
  • October 05, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
September, 2021
  • September 30, 2021: [Order on Motion to Suppress]
  • September 30, 2021: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
August, 2021
  • August 24, 2021: [Continue]
  • August 19, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • August 18, 2021: [Continue]
  • August 16, 2021: [Order on Motion to Strike ]
  • August 12, 2021: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • August 12, 2021: [Strike]
  • August 03, 2021: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
July, 2021
  • July 13, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • July 12, 2021: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • July 06, 2021: [Suppress]
  • July 06, 2021: [Dismiss]
  • July 02, 2021: [Procedural / Scheduling Order]
  • July 02, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
  • July 02, 2021: [Dismiss]
June, 2021
  • June 22, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
  • June 10, 2021: [Certificate]
  • June 08, 2021: [Certificate]
May, 2021
  • May 21, 2021: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
  • May 20, 2021: [Procedural / Scheduling Order]
  • May 20, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
  • May 19, 2021: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • May 19, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • May 19, 2021: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • May 19, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 13, 2021: [Video Conference Waiver]
  • May 13, 2021: [Plea Agreement]
  • May 11, 2021: [Video Conference Waiver]
  • May 11, 2021: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
  • May 11, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Pretrial Motions]
  • May 11, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
  • May 10, 2021: [Reconsideration, Review, or to Vacate Order of Detention]
  • May 10, 2021: [Notice of Docket Entry Correction (PDF) - (ECF Admin Only)]
  • May 07, 2021: [Extension of Time to File Pretrial Motions]
  • May 07, 2021: [Plea Agreement]
April, 2021
  • April 13, 2021: [Order on Motion for Protective Order ]
  • April 12, 2021: [Protective Order]
March, 2021
  • March 26, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Pretrial Motions]
  • March 24, 2021: [Extension of Time to File Pretrial Motions]
  • March 02, 2021: [Motion Hearing]
February, 2021
  • February 25, 2021: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • February 24, 2021: [Video Conference Waiver]
  • February 23, 2021: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
  • February 22, 2021: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • February 08, 2021: [Notice of Docket Entry Correction (PDF) - (ECF Admin Only)]
  • February 08, 2021: [Procedural / Scheduling Order]
  • February 08, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
  • February 08, 2021: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • February 08, 2021: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • February 05, 2021: [Video Conference Waiver]
January, 2021
  • January 27, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
  • January 12, 2021: [Plea Agreement]
  • January 12, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • January 12, 2021: [Continue]
December, 2020
  • December 07, 2020: [Notice of Hearing]
  • December 04, 2020: [Plea Agreement]
  • December 01, 2020: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Pretrial Motions]
November, 2020
  • November 24, 2020: [Extension of Time to File Pretrial Motions]
September, 2020
  • September 29, 2020: [Waiver of Personal Appearance at Arraignment]
  • September 23, 2020: [Teleconference Waiver]
  • September 23, 2020: [Notice of Hearing]
  • September 22, 2020: [Waiver of Personal Appearance at Arraignment]
  • September 22, 2020: [Notice of Hearing]
  • September 21, 2020: [Notice of Hearing]
  • September 18, 2020: [Notice of Hearing]
  • September 18, 2020: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • September 17, 2020: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • September 16, 2020: [Order of Detention]
  • September 16, 2020: [Teleconference Waiver]
  • September 16, 2020: [Continue]
  • September 15, 2020: [Indictment]
  • September 15, 2020: [Continue]
  • September 15, 2020: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
  • September 15, 2020: [Document Unsealed]
August, 2020
  • August 19, 2020: [Procedural / Scheduling Order]
  • August 19, 2020: [Notice of Hearing]
  • August 19, 2020: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • August 19, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 19, 2020: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • August 19, 2020: [~Util - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • August 19, 2020: [Teleconference Waiver]
  • August 10, 2020: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Pretrial Motions]
  • August 10, 2020: [Extension of Time to File Pretrial Motions]
July, 2020
  • July 29, 2020: [Notice of Hearing]
  • July 29, 2020: [Plea Agreement]
  • July 28, 2020: [Bond Revocation Hearing]
  • July 20, 2020: [Notice of Hearing]
  • July 20, 2020: [Order on Motion for Hearing]
  • July 17, 2020: [Hearing]
  • July 15, 2020: [Notice of Hearing]
  • July 15, 2020: [Procedural / Scheduling Order]
  • July 15, 2020: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • July 15, 2020: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • July 15, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • July 15, 2020: [~Util - Terminate Deadlines]
  • July 15, 2020: [Plea Agreement]
  • July 10, 2020: [Notice of Hearing]
June, 2020
  • June 03, 2020: [Order on Motion to File Under Seal (NEF is sent - Order is not sealed)]
May, 2020
  • May 29, 2020: [Video Conference Waiver]
  • May 19, 2020: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
  • May 18, 2020: [File Under Seal (NEF is sent - PDF is Sealed)(COURT USE ONLY)]
  • May 15, 2020: [Notice of Docket Entry Correction (ECF Admin Only)]
  • May 15, 2020: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • May 08, 2020: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • May 08, 2020: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • May 08, 2020: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • May 05, 2020: [Appoint Counsel]
April, 2020
  • April 30, 2020: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • April 27, 2020: [Sever]
  • April 27, 2020: [Waiver of Personal Appearance at Hearing (non-arraignment)]
  • April 24, 2020: [Waiver of Personal Appearance at Hearing (non-arraignment)]
  • April 24, 2020: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
  • April 23, 2020: [Motions No Longer Referred]
  • April 23, 2020: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Pretrial Motions]
  • April 23, 2020: [Extension of Time to File Pretrial Motions]
  • April 23, 2020: [Release from Custody]
March, 2020
  • March 13, 2020: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • March 12, 2020: [Modify Conditions of Release]
  • March 12, 2020: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • March 12, 2020: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • March 12, 2020: [Motion Hearing]
  • March 09, 2020: [Letter]
  • March 06, 2020: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
  • March 06, 2020: [Motions Referred]
  • March 05, 2020: [Reconsideration, Review, or to Vacate Order of Detention]
  • March 03, 2020: [Receipt for Passport]
  • March 02, 2020: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • March 02, 2020: [Pretrial Scheduling Order]
  • March 02, 2020: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 (NEF is sent - PDF is sealed)]
  • March 02, 2020: [Initial Appearance]
  • March 02, 2020: [~Util - Ruling on Motions]
  • March 02, 2020: [Arraignment]
  • March 02, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • March 02, 2020: [CJA 20 - Appointment]
  • March 01, 2020: [Detention]
February, 2020
  • February 21, 2020: [Order of Detention]
  • February 21, 2020: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 (NEF is sent - PDF is sealed)]
  • February 21, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • February 21, 2020: [Arraignment]
  • February 21, 2020: [~Util - Ruling on Motions]
  • February 21, 2020: [Initial Appearance]
  • February 20, 2020: [Detention]
  • February 14, 2020: [Order of Detention]
  • February 14, 2020: [Detention Hearing]
  • February 14, 2020: [~Util - Ruling on Motions]
  • February 13, 2020: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • February 13, 2020: [Order Scheduling a Detention Hearing]
  • February 13, 2020: [Pretrial Scheduling Order]
  • February 13, 2020: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 (NEF is sent - PDF is sealed)]
  • February 13, 2020: [Arraignment]
  • February 13, 2020: [Initial Appearance]
  • February 13, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • February 12, 2020: [CJA 20 - Appointment]
  • February 12, 2020: [Detention]
  • February 03, 2020: [Waiver of Personal Appearance at Arraignment]
  • February 03, 2020: [CJA 20 - Appointment]
  • February 03, 2020: [Notice of Hearing]
January, 2020
  • January 31, 2020: [Notice of Hearing]
  • January 23, 2020: [Request for Writ]
  • January 16, 2020: [Indictment - Redacted]
  • January 02, 2020: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
December, 2019
  • December 23, 2019: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Pretrial Motions]
  • December 21, 2019: [Extension of Time to File Pretrial Motions]
November, 2019
  • November 15, 2019: [~Util - Ruling on Motions]
October, 2019
  • October 30, 2019: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
  • October 30, 2019: [Motion Hearing]
  • October 25, 2019: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • October 21, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • October 21, 2019: [Pretrial Scheduling Order]
  • October 21, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 (NEF is sent - PDF is sealed)]
  • October 21, 2019: [Initial Appearance]
  • October 21, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • October 21, 2019: [~Util - Ruling on Motions]
  • October 21, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • October 18, 2019: [Detention]
  • October 18, 2019: [Certificate]
  • October 17, 2019: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
  • October 15, 2019: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
  • October 15, 2019: [Order]
  • October 15, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • October 10, 2019: [Motions Referred]
  • October 10, 2019: [Release from Custody]
  • October 08, 2019: [Notice of Hearing]
  • October 08, 2019: [CJA 20 - Appointment]
September, 2019
  • September 30, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • September 30, 2019: [~Util - Terminate Deadlines]
  • September 27, 2019: [Request for Writ]
  • September 27, 2019: [Indictment]
  • September 04, 2019: [Notice of Hearing]
June, 2019
  • June 05, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • June 05, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • June 05, 2019: [~Util - Ruling on Motions]
  • June 04, 2019: [Warrant Returned Executed]
May, 2019
  • May 31, 2019: [Order Scheduling a Detention Hearing]
  • May 31, 2019: [Pretrial Scheduling Order]
  • May 31, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • May 31, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • May 31, 2019: [Initial Appearance]
  • May 31, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 (NEF is sent - PDF is sealed)]
  • May 31, 2019: [CJA 20 - Appointment]
  • May 31, 2019: [Detention]
  • May 31, 2019: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.