U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Vermont

vermont Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Vermont
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:19-cr-00081-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Villeneuve
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2021
  • May 12, 2021: [Judgment on Revocation]
April, 2021
  • April 28, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • April 26, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
October, 2020
  • October 21, 2020: [Notice of Docket Entry Correction (PDF) - (ECF Admin Only)]
  • October 14, 2020: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • October 13, 2020: [Video Conference Waiver]
  • October 09, 2020: [Notice of Hearing]
September, 2020
  • September 14, 2020: [Teleconference Waiver]
  • September 14, 2020: [Warrant Returned Executed]
February, 2020
  • February 18, 2020: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • February 14, 2020: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
January, 2020
  • January 14, 2020: [Notice of Hearing]
  • January 09, 2020: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • January 09, 2020: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • January 09, 2020: [CJA 20 - Appointment]
  • January 09, 2020: [Document Unsealed]
November, 2019
  • November 14, 2019: [Notice of Docket Entry Correction (PDF) - (ECF Admin Only)]
  • November 14, 2019: [Judgment]
  • November 13, 2019: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • November 13, 2019: [Sentencing]
  • November 05, 2019: [Sentencing Memorandum]
  • November 01, 2019: [Sentencing Memorandum and Motion for Downward Departure]
October, 2019
  • October 07, 2019: [Motion Hearing]
  • October 07, 2019: [~Util - Ruling on Motions]
September, 2019
  • September 26, 2019: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
  • September 26, 2019: [Reconsideration, Review, or to Vacate Order of Detention]
August, 2019
  • August 22, 2019: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • August 19, 2019: [Search and Seizure Warrant Returned Executed]
July, 2019
  • July 24, 2019: [Procedural / Scheduling Order]
  • July 24, 2019: [Notice of Hearing]
  • July 19, 2019: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • July 19, 2019: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • July 19, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • July 19, 2019: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • July 19, 2019: [~Util - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
May, 2019
  • May 31, 2019: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • May 31, 2019: [Notice of Hearing]
  • May 31, 2019: [Plea Agreement]
  • May 31, 2019: [Information - Felony]
  • May 31, 2019: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.