U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Vermont

vermont Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Vermont
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:18-cr-00102-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Lipsey
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
June, 2020
  • June 25, 2020: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • June 24, 2020: [Dismiss]
  • June 01, 2020: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Pretrial Motions]
May, 2020
  • May 28, 2020: [Extension of Time to File Pretrial Motions]
March, 2020
  • March 26, 2020: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Pretrial Motions]
  • March 26, 2020: [Extension of Time to File Pretrial Motions]
February, 2020
  • February 03, 2020: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Pretrial Motions]
January, 2020
  • January 31, 2020: [Extension of Time to File Pretrial Motions]
  • January 02, 2020: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Pretrial Motions]
December, 2019
  • December 26, 2019: [Extension of Time to File Pretrial Motions]
November, 2019
  • November 05, 2019: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Pretrial Motions]
  • November 04, 2019: [Extension of Time to File Pretrial Motions]
October, 2019
  • October 09, 2019: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Pretrial Motions]
  • October 04, 2019: [Extension of Time to File Pretrial Motions]
September, 2019
  • September 05, 2019: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Pretrial Motions]
  • September 04, 2019: [Extension of Time to File Pretrial Motions]
August, 2019
  • August 08, 2019: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Pretrial Motions]
  • August 07, 2019: [Extension of Time to File Pretrial Motions]
June, 2019
  • June 13, 2019: [Notice of Docket Entry Correction (PDF) - (ECF Admin Only)]
  • June 13, 2019: [Notice of Appearance - Defendant]
  • June 04, 2019: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • June 03, 2019: [Pretrial Scheduling Order]
  • June 03, 2019: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • June 03, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 (NEF is sent - PDF is sealed)]
  • June 03, 2019: [Initial Appearance]
  • June 03, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • June 03, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • June 03, 2019: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.