U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Vermont

vermont Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Vermont
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:19-cr-00077-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Thomas
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 18, 2025: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • April 18, 2025: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • April 18, 2025: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
November, 2022
  • November 09, 2022: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • November 07, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • November 01, 2022: [Order of Prosecutorial Obligation Under Fed. R. Crim. P. 5(f)]
  • November 01, 2022: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • November 01, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 (NEF is sent - PDF is sealed)]
October, 2022
  • October 31, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • October 31, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • October 31, 2022: [Probation Form 12]
  • October 14, 2022: [Docket Annotation]
February, 2022
  • February 25, 2022: [Transfer Out/Probationer]
July, 2021
  • July 19, 2021: [Probation Form 12B]
August, 2020
  • August 21, 2020: [Satisfaction of Judgment]
March, 2020
  • March 09, 2020: [Judgment]
  • March 09, 2020: [~Util - Terminate Parties]
  • March 09, 2020: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • March 05, 2020: [Sentencing]
  • March 05, 2020: [Receipt for Payment (criminal debt)]
February, 2020
  • February 25, 2020: [Sentencing Memorandum and Motion for Downward Departure]
  • February 24, 2020: [Sentencing Memorandum]
November, 2019
  • November 05, 2019: [Procedural / Scheduling Order]
  • November 05, 2019: [Notice of Hearing]
  • November 05, 2019: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • November 05, 2019: [~Util - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • November 05, 2019: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • November 05, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
October, 2019
  • October 16, 2019: [Notice of Hearing]
  • October 10, 2019: [Plea Agreement]
August, 2019
  • August 27, 2019: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Pretrial Motions]
  • August 26, 2019: [Extension of Time to File Pretrial Motions]
July, 2019
  • July 22, 2019: [Notice of Hearing]
  • July 17, 2019: [Indictment]
June, 2019
  • June 28, 2019: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • June 27, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • June 27, 2019: [Pretrial Scheduling Order]
  • June 27, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 (NEF is sent - PDF is sealed)]
  • June 27, 2019: [Initial Appearance]
  • June 27, 2019: [~Util - Ruling on Motions]
  • June 27, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • June 27, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • June 24, 2019: [Notice of Appearance - Defendant]
  • June 13, 2019: [Detention]
  • June 13, 2019: [Notice of Hearing]
  • June 13, 2019: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • June 06, 2019: [Request for Writ]
  • June 05, 2019: [Indictment Unsealed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.